Whitlock Packaging Corporation v. Stearns et al
Plaintiff: Whitlock Packaging Corporation
Defendant: Brian Stearns and Fuzzee Bee Beverage, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv02453
Filed: September 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 181 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Whitlock Packaging Corporation against Fuzzee Bee Beverage, LLC and Brian Stearns on the counterclaims pursuant to 175 Order, by Clerk on 4/23/2015. (ebuch)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/9/15 granting 86 Motion for Summary Judgment. (nmarb, )
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER; Defendants Brian Stearns and Fuzzee Bee Beverages, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Brief in Support 87 is DENIED, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/8/15.(morti, )
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 SECOND AMENDED TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER. Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference set for 4/13/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Proposed Final Pretrial Order due by 4/6/2015. Four day jury trial set for 5/11/2015 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/20/15. (sgrim)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 AMENDED TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER. Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference set for 4/13/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/6/2015. Four day jury trial set for 5/11/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/8/15. (sgrim)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER. Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference set for 5/15/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/8/2015. Four day jury trial set for 6/22/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/6/15. (sgrim)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 101 Joint Application of Leave to File Notice of Availability of United States Magistrate and Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge Outside the Time Allowed by D.C.Colo.LCivR 72.2(d) by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/12/14.(dkals, )
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER denying as untimely 94 Notice of Availability of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/1/14. (dkals, )
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2014 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Defendants Brian Stearns and Fuzzee Bee Beverages, LLC's Motion to Compel 83 is DENIED. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/22/14. (sgrim)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER. Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Entry of Agreed Protective Order 67 is DENIED without prejudice, and the proposed Protective Order is REFUSED, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/18/14.(sgrim)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER accepting 57 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge, and granting 47 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim for Malicious Prosecution, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/7/14. (dkals, )
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER granting 38 Uncontested Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, and denying as moot 9 Motion to Dismiss Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/31/14.(dkals, )
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting for 1/14/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201, before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/22/13. (dkals, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitlock Packaging Corporation v. Stearns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitlock Packaging Corporation
Represented By: Steven C. Janiszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Stearns
Represented By: David Royce Keesling
Represented By: Steven Robert Schumacher
Represented By: Heidi Leigh Shadid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuzzee Bee Beverage, LLC
Represented By: David Royce Keesling
Represented By: Steven Robert Schumacher
Represented By: Heidi Leigh Shadid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?