Hatlee et al v. Hardey et al
Plaintiff: Randall J. Hatlee and Ronald L. Swift
Defendant: Cindy Hardey, Bobbi Priestly, Monte Gore, Fred Wegener and Ashleigh Olds Diedrich
Case Number: 1:2013cv02469
Filed: September 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Park
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER dimissing as moot 125 Motion for Extension of Time to File and 137 Motion to Strike. Claims and causes of action asserted against Defendants Cindy Hardey, Bobbi Priestly, Monte Gore, and Fred Wegener in their individual and official capac ities are dismissed with prejudice. Each party to pay their own costs and fees. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Defendant Ashley Olds pursuant to the 110 Order entered on 9/29/2015. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/11/2016. (cpear)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER re: Trial Schedule. It is ORDERED that the parties to this case are to file submissions with this Court within seven days from the date of this Order explaining how many days will be needed for trial given the current status of this case. Submissions may be no longer than two pages in length, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/18/2015. (cthom, )
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER. 31 Motion to Dismiss Party is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as moot. 61 and 65 Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED. 64 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. 66 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. 95 Motion to Supplement is DENIED. The 90 Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge is APPROVED and ADOPTED. 63 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED. 99 Objections to the Recommendation are OVERRULED. 107 Objection to the Order of USMJ Watanabe is DENIED. 102 Motion for Leave is GRANTED. All as indicated in the attached Order. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 09/29/2015. (athom, )
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Setting Case for Trial by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/31/15. A 10-day Jury Trial set is for 2/1/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for 1/6/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge Raymond P. Moore. (dkals, )
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 83 Motion to Clarify Regarding the Court's Civil Practice Standards or in the Alternative Motion for Leave. Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 64, 65 and 66) are hereby accepted as filed as of December 15, 2014. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/21/2015.(tscha, )
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER granting 74 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 34 amended. Final Pretrial Conference 1/26/2015 09:30 AM is vacated. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 3/30/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/7/2015.(emill)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER granting 54 Unopposed Motion by Defendant Olds to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/20/2014. Dispositive Motions Deadline is extended to 12/15/2014. (slibi, )
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Motion for settlement conference. Magistrate Judge Watanabe is authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this case. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/17/2014.(tscha, )
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER granting 44 Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/20/2014. Discovery due by 10/31/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due on or before 1/20/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (slibi, )
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER granting 37 plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 34 is amended. Discovery due by 8/29/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2014. Final Pretrial Conference 10/1/2014 09:00 AM is vacated. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/18/2014. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 11/25/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/21/2014.(emill)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying as moot 11 Motion to Dismiss Party. by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/18/2013.(trlee, )
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Plannign Conference. Scheduling/Planning Conference is set for 11/4/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/11/13. (alvsl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatlee et al v. Hardey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall J. Hatlee
Represented By: Brice A. Tondre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald L. Swift
Represented By: Brice A. Tondre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Hardey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbi Priestly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monte Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Wegener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashleigh Olds Diedrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?