Kaczar v. California Casualty Indemnity Exchange
Plaintiff: Katey L. Kaczar
Defendant: California Casualty Indemnity Exchange
Case Number: 1:2013cv02500
Filed: September 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear his, her or its own costs and attorney fees by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 01/06/14. (jjhsl, )
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a five-day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on December 1, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for November 21, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/18/2013. (rbjsec. )
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 09/18/2013. (rbjsec. )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaczar v. California Casualty Indemnity Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Casualty Indemnity Exchange
Represented By: Frederick W. Klann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katey L. Kaczar
Represented By: Barry Ira Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?