Jacobs et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Dean L. Jacobs and Marcielle S. Jacobs
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Wayne E. Vaden, Wayne (I) E. Vaden, Robert Liljander, Robert (I) Liljander, Richard E. Pettitt, Lawrence E. Castle, Castle Law Group, LLC, Lawrence (I) E. Castle, Yvonne (I) G. Smith, Gordon (I) D. Smith, Mortgage Electronic Registration System (MERS) and MERSCORP Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv02518
Filed: September 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Elbert
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER That Defendant Lawrence E. Castles Motion for Attorney Fees 109 filed August 21, 2014, is granted; That under 42 U.S.C. § 1988, defendant Lawrence E. Castle is awarded attorney fees of 5,260.00 dollars; That Defendant Vaden Law Firm, LLCs Motion for Attorneys Fees 112 filed August 29, 2014, is granted; That under 42 U.S.C. § 1988, §12-14-113 (1.5), C.R.S., 15 U.S.C. § 1692k(a)(3), and §6-1-113(3), C.R.S., defendant Vaden Law Firm, LLC is awarded attorney fees of 29,310.00 dollars; That the plaintiffs, Dean L. Jacobs and Marcielle S. Jacobs, shall be jointly and severally liable for the attorney fees awarded in this order; and That on or before April 24, 2015, the plaintiffs, Dean L. Jacobs and Marcielle S. Jacobs, shall pay to the defendants, Lawrence E. Castle and the Vaden Law Firm, LLC, the reasonable attorney fees awarded to those defendants in this order. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/26/2015.(evana, )
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 JUDGMENT by Clerk on 8/8/2014, in favor of defendants against plaintiffs. See 105 Order. (trlee, )
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 45 Motion to Dismiss; denying 49 Motion for Entry of Default; granting 52 Motion to Dismiss; denying 56 Motion for Entry of Default; adopting 57 Report an d Recommendations, granting 67 Motion to Dismiss; granting 73 Motion to Dismiss; adopting 84 Report and Recommendations, adopting 85 Report and Recommendations, adopting 86 Report and Recommendations, adopting 87 Report and Recommendations. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/7/2014. (trlee, )
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER granting 66 The Ocwen Defendants' Motion for Leave toFile Motion to Dismiss In Excess of Page Limitations Set Forth in Reb Civ.Practice Standard IV.B.1. The Ocwen Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) [# 67 ] is accepted for filing. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/17/2013.(klyon, )
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER granting 41 Defendant Vaden Law Firm, LLC's Motion forLeave to file Motion in Excess of Page Limits. Defendant Vaden Law Firm, LLCmay file a Motion to Dismiss in excess of the page limits up to 20 pages in length. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/15/2013.(klyon, )
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER: 38 Motion to Withdraw Defendant Vaden Law Firm, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Motion in Excess of Page Limits is GRANTED. The motion docketed as # 35 , Defendant Vaden Law Firm, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Motion in Excess of Page Limits, is DENIED AS WITHDRAWN. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/13/2013.(klyon, )
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying as moot 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond ; denying as moot 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond ; denying as moot 13 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying without prejudice 14 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice 16 Motion to Dismiss. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/10/13.(bnbcd, )
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. Ordered that the Complaint 1 is Stricken. Plaintiffs have until 10/23/13 to submit an Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court shall enclose with this Order a copy of the Court's Complaint form by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/09/13. (jjhsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean L. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcielle S. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Financial Corporation
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne E. Vaden
Represented By: Nancy Lin Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne (I) E. Vaden
Represented By: Nancy Lin Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Liljander
Represented By: Katharine Anne Jensen
Represented By: Robert James Zavaglia, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert (I) Liljander
Represented By: Katharine Anne Jensen
Represented By: Robert James Zavaglia, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard E. Pettitt
Represented By: Sam D. Starritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence E. Castle
Represented By: Christopher T. Groen
Represented By: Phillip A. Vaglica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castle Law Group, LLC
Represented By: Christopher T. Groen
Represented By: Phillip A. Vaglica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence (I) E. Castle
Represented By: Christopher T. Groen
Represented By: Phillip A. Vaglica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvonne (I) G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon (I) D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System (MERS)
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERSCORP Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?