OCD Telluride LLC v. Blaney McMurtry LLP
Plaintiff: OCD Telluride LLC
Defendant: Blaney McMurtry LLP
Case Number: 1:2013cv02584
Filed: September 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: San Miguel
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER; 47 Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and for Summary Judgment is DENIED. 29 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs RICO Conspiracy Claim is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the effect of this dismissal as to Plaintiffs Second Claim for Relief is STAYED for a period of ten days to allow Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint and cure thejurisdictional defect, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/13/16.(morti, )
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/16/15. (sgrim)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING: Scheduling and Planning Conference set for 6/11/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/10/2015. (alowe)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER LIFTING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE: Plaintiff's 26 Unopposed Motion to Reopen Case is granted. Defendant's 16 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's RICO Conspiracy Claim shall be reinstated on the docket as a pending motion with a fil ing date of 4/8/2015. The Amended Plaintiff's 21 Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss shall be reinstated on the docket with a filing date of 4/8/2015. By 4/29/2015, the defendant may file a reply in support of its motion to dismi ss. The stay of discovery which was in place when this case was closed administratively shall remain in place pending assessment by the magistrate judge of the continued need for a stay of discovery; and the order of reference [# 4 ] to the magistrate judge shall remain in full force and effect. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/8/2015. (alowe)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER adopting 19 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. This action is CLOSED ADMINISTRATIVELY. Any motions pending in this case, including the motion to dismiss [# 16 ], are TERMINATED without prejudice as a result ofthe administrative closure of this case. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/3/2014.(klyon, )
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Motion Hearing held on 1/17/2014, granting 10 Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery. The Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2014 is vacated. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-401. (mehcd) Modified on 1/17/2014 to correct text (mehcd).
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order to be submitted by 12/10/2013. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/2/13. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OCD Telluride LLC v. Blaney McMurtry LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OCD Telluride LLC
Represented By: Corey Thomas Zurbuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaney McMurtry LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?