Johnson v. Santini et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Clay Johnson
Defendant: George Santini, Alicia Vineyard, Allyson Alvarado, Gilberta Trujillo, T. K. Cozza-Rhodes and Peter Bludworth
Case Number: 1:2013cv02664
Filed: September 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 JUDGMENT by Clerk: in favor of Alicia Vinyard, George Santini, Peter Bludworth, T.K. Cozza Rhodes against Joshua C. Johnson re: 102 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment and Order on Report and Recommendations. By Clerk on 9/17/15. (kfinn)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: granting 55 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations re 96 Report and Recommendations. Judgment shall enter in favor of the defendants, George Santini, Alicia Vineyard, T.K. Cozza Rhodes, Peter Bludworth, against the plaintiff, Joshua C. Johnson; The defendants are awarded their costs to be taxed by the clerk of the court in the time and manner prescribed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/16/15. (kfinn)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECUSE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/8/15. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse 91 is DENIED. (bsimm, )
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery and to Defer Considering the Motion for Summary Judgment; 87 Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED IN PART to the extent it seeks and order compelling Defendant Santini to respond to the Interroga tories, and is DENIED IN PART to the extent it seeks an order compelling Defendants to produce materials responsive to the Requests for Production. Plaintiffs Motion 87 is GRANTED to the extent it seeks relief under Rule 56(d), by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/17/15.(morti, )
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/21/14 re: Motion for Joinder of Claims and Joinder of Parties 62 . The Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of the court's prisoner complaint form to the plaintiff. (bsimm, )
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/4/14. Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery 57 is DENIED. (bsimm, )
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/7/14. The Order to Show Cause 46 is DISCHARGED. A supplemental preliminary scheduling conference is set for 10/24/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Plaintiff and his case manager shall contact the court by phone. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this Order to Case Manager for Joshua C. Johnson. (bsimm, )
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying as moot 41 Motion for Extension of Time to File ; denying 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. A copy will be mailed to the Case Manager for Joshua Johnson. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/2/2014.(trlee, )
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 30 Plaintiff's Motion Demaning [sic] Defedant's [sic] to Disclose. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/19/2014.(klyon, )
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/24/14. On or before March 3, 2014, defendants Santini, Vinyard, Cozza Rhodes, and Bludworth shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (Simmons, B.)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/02/2013. (skl)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/16/2013. (skl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Santini et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Clay Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Santini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allyson Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilberta Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. K. Cozza-Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Bludworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?