Mallett v. Law et al
Plaintiff: Dawane Arthur Mallett
Defendant: David B. Berkebile, Russell Krist, Dianna Krist, G. Sandusky, N. Lee, A. Balsick, David Owen Law and Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 1:2013cv02676
Filed: October 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FINAL JUDGMENT re: 43 Order on Report and Recommendations. Signed by Clerk on 06/06/2014. (athom, )
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER AFFIRMING 42 MAY 15, 2014 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/05/2014.(athom, )
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 plaintiff's Motion to Add Parties. The motion is granted to the extent that the claims against unserved defendants Russell Krist and N. Lee are dismissed, and defendants Krist and Lee sh all be removed from the caption. The motion is denied to the extent that plaintiff shall not be permitted to add two defendants. Order to Show Cause 28 is vacated; the Show Cause Hearing 4/14/2014 09:30 AM is vacated. Scheduling Conference remains set 4/14/2014 09:30 AM. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/11/2014.(mjwcd)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Affirming 26 Report and Recommendations, and denying 20 Motion for Emergency Hearing, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/3/14.(dkals, )
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF Status Conference set for 2/6/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/12/2013. (mjwcd)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/15/13. 9 Motion to Strike Defendants is granted, and Defendants David B. Berkebile, Federal Bureau of Prisons, and Dianna Krist are dismissed. (dkals, )
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/29/2013. (skl)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/02/13. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mallett v. Law et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Berkebile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Krist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianna Krist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Sandusky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Balsick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Owen Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawane Arthur Mallett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?