Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.176.105.154
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.176.105.154
Case Number: 1:2013cv02781
Filed: October 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DISMISSING CASE that the Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice is APPROVED and this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/15/2014. (evana, )
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge dated April 22, 2014 ECF No. 31 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. In accordance therewith, it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Affirmative Defenses filed March 11, 2014 ECF No. 23 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. It is GRANTED as to the first, second, fourth, fifth and tenth affirmative defenses, and these defenses are STRICKEN. It is DENIED as to the eighth affirmative defense (copyright misuse), by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/16/2014.(evana, )
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 3 Plaintiff's Motion and Memorandum for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/18/2013. (mehcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.176.105.154
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.176.105.154
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Jason Aaron Kotzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?