February 24, 2016 |
Filing
282
ORDER denying 178 and 180 Motions for Attorney Fees. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/24/2016. (athom, )
|
February 22, 2016 |
Filing
281
ORDER denying 171 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 188 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/22/2016. (athom, )
|
February 8, 2016 |
Filing
278
MINUTE ORDER re: 274 275 Notice of Entry of Appearance by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/8/16. Messrs. McCarthy and Williams are partners in my former law firm, Faegre Baker Daniels LLP, which would ordinarily prompt this court to immedi ately recuse from further service in this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(b). No later than 2/22/2016, any Party with an objection to this Magistrate Judge ruling upon Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's Expert should file such an objection. (bsimm, )
|
February 5, 2016 |
Filing
273
ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration 184 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/05/16.(jhawk, )
|
January 11, 2016 |
Filing
270
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held on 1/11/2016 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's Expert Steven Plitt, Esq. 255 is ARGUED, SUBMITTED and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Written order to issue. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (bsimm, )
|
August 21, 2015 |
Filing
248
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 198 Motion to Strike. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/21/15. (nywlc1)
|
August 18, 2015 |
Filing
247
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held on 8/18/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. American Family's Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid 702 to Strike the Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Garth Allen 198 is SUBMITTED and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (bsimm, )
|
July 15, 2015 |
Filing
237
ORDER ON PENDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/15/15. The Motion to Quash and for Protective Order 216 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; Dismissed Parties Granite State and National Union's Motion to Quash and fo r Protective Order as to Rule 30(b)(6) Notices 218 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; Dismissed Parties Granite State and National Union's Amended Motion to Quash and for Protective Order Re: Gorski Deposition 224 is DENIED; Unopposed Motion to Reset the Pre-Trial Conference and to Extend the Time to Take Depositions 235 is GRANTED. The Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2015 is VACATED and RESET to 9/8/2015 03:30 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (bsimm, )
|
July 1, 2015 |
Filing
233
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held on 7/1/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Dismissed Parties Granite State Insurance Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh's Motion to Quash Subpoena for Pr otective Order Re: Gorski Deposition 221 is DENIED as MOOT. Motion to Quash Subpoena and Motion for Protective Order 216 is SUBMITTED and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Dismissed Parties Granite State Insurance Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh's Motion to Quash Subpoenas and for Protective Order Re: American Family's Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions 218 is SUBMITTED and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Dismissed Parties Granite State Insurance Company and Nation al Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh's Amended Motion to Quash Subpoena for Protective Order Re: Gorski Deposition 224 is SUBMITTED and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. A hearing is set on American Family's Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid 702 to Strike the Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Garth Allen 198 for August 18, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (bsimm, )
|
June 5, 2015 |
Filing
212
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 06/05/15 granting 209 Motion for Discovery. Final Pretrial Conference is re-set for 7/28/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang.(nmarb, )
|
March 31, 2015 |
Filing
177
ORDER granting 71 , 83 , and 95 Motions to Dismiss; denying as moot 137 and 148 Motions to Compel; denying as moot 173 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. American Family's Third-Party Complaint is DISMISSED IN ITS ENTIRETY. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1), Third-Party Defendants shall have their costs by filing a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of the Court within ten days of the entry of judgment. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/31/2015. (athom, )
|
March 3, 2015 |
Filing
168
COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 3/3/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff American Family's Motion to Compel Third Party Defendant Granite State Insurance Company to Produce Its Claim File for I n Camera Review and Production and Request for Expedited Ruling 137 is SUBMITTED and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff American Family's Motion to Compel Third Party Defendants Veronica Turner and Glen Turner to Produce C ommunications with Tiffaney Norton 148 is SUBMITTED and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Third Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order 156 is GRANTED. The discovery deadline is extended to January 26, 2015. Defendant American Family is permitted one additional request for production. FTR: Courtroom C-205. (bsimm, )
|
November 18, 2014 |
Filing
136
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/18/14 re: Unopposed Second Motion to Modify Scheduling Order 134 . The Motion is GRANTED and the Scheduling Order is amended. Expert witness disclosures: 1/23/2015; Rebuttal experts: 3/2/2 015; Motions to Amend: 1/20/2015; Discovery due by 3/27/2015; Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2015. The Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2015, is vacated and reset to 7/13/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. The proposed Pretrial Order is due by 7/6/2015. (bsimm, )
|
October 27, 2014 |
Filing
131
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/27/14 re: Third-Party Defendants National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh's and Granite State Insurance Company's Motion for Protective Order or in the Alternative Motion for In C amera Review 115 . The Motion for Protective Order is DENIED insofar as it is based on the theory that National Union and Granite State should not be subjected to discovery until it is determined that there is a viable claim to support discovery; and DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE insofar as it is based on the attorney-client privilege and/or the work product immunity. (bsimm, )
|
October 6, 2014 |
Filing
127
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/6/14 re: Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order 125 . The Motion is GRANTED and the Scheduling Order is amended as follows: Expert witness disclosures due by 11/24/2014. Rebuttal experts due by 12/30/2014. Join or Amend due by 11/20/2014. Discovery due by 1/26/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 3/16/2015. The Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2015, is vacated and reset to 5/14/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/7/2015.(bsimm, )
|
August 5, 2014 |
Filing
105
PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/5/14. (bsimm, )
|
June 17, 2014 |
Filing
90
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/17/14 re: Partially Unopposed Motion to clarify the Record as Recited in Doc. 59 62 . The Motion is DENIED AS MOOT. (bsimm, )
|
June 16, 2014 |
Filing
89
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/16/14. The Motion of Third-Party Defendant Special Kids Special Families, Inc. to Dismissfor Failure to State a Claim 39 is DENIED AS MOOT. Third-Party Defendant Veronica Turner's Motion to Dismis s 40 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Third-Party Defendant Glenn Turner's Motion to Dismiss 51 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. On or before July 7, 2014, Third-Party Defendants Veronica Turner and Glenn Turner may submit new motions to dismiss which are directed at the First Amended Third Party Complaint. (bsimm)
|
May 20, 2014 |
Filing
78
MINUTE ORDER. It is Ordered that the Granite State Insurance Companys and National UnionFire Insurance Company of Pittsburghs Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) 43 is DENIED AS WITHDRAWN. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/20/2014. (athom, )
|
February 14, 2014 |
Filing
48
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/14/14 46 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Multiple Motions to Dismiss as to 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Third Party Claim), 43 MOTION to Di smiss , 40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference set for April 25, 2014, is vacated and reset to June 12, 2014, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom A-401. (Simmons, B.)
|
December 11, 2013 |
Filing
15
MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Unopposed Motion to File Third Party Complaint by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/11/13.(dkals, )
|
December 9, 2013 |
Filing
12
MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion to Vacate and Reset by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/9/13.The Scheduling Conference is reset to 2/12/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. (dkals, )
|
October 23, 2013 |
Filing
9
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 12/6/2013. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/23/13. (bnbcd, )
|