Brooks v. Oba et al
Plaintiff: Jason Brooks
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections, David Oba, Patrick Blake, Angie Turner, Corrections Corporation of America, Dolores Montoya, Debra Foster, Julie Russell, Susan Jones, Kathy Howell, Tim Creany, Anthony DeCesaro, Paul Cline, Lou Archuletta, Yvette Brown, David Tessiere, Rick Raemisch and Kellie Wasko
Case Number: 1:2013cv02894
Filed: October 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER denying 176 Plaintiff's Motion for Review of Clerk's Bill of Costs Determination, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 01/23/17. (nmarb, )
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER denying 162 Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis re 161 Notice of Appeal. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/9/2016. (cbslc2)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Upon review of the Joint Motion for Protective Order, the motion is GRANTED and the PROTECTIVE ORDER is issued. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/15/2016. (cbslc2)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion to Dismiss. The CDOC Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED as to Defendant Montoya and Defendant Creany. The claims against these defendants are dismissed in their entirety. As explained in the opinion, the Motion is GRANTED in part as to Defendant Tessier. The Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as to Defendant Russell and Defendant Howell. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 07/01/2015.(cbslc2)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER re 60 Motion for Reconsideration. Following a review of Plaintiff's motion and the related briefing, the Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 06/10/2015.(cbslc2)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting Service by United States Marshal of 68 Second Amended Prisoner Complaint, filed by Jason Brooks, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 05/19/15. (nmarb, )
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/26/14 DENYING without prejudice 61 Plaintiff's Motion To File an Amended Complaint. The Clerk is directed to mail a Prisoner Complaint Form 1983 to Mr. Brooks.(nmarb, )
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/18/14. Defendants Yvette Brown and Anthony DeCesaro are dismissed. (dkals, )
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion for Status, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/07/2014.(slibi, )
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and 7 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/13/13.(dkals, )
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/24/2013. (skl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Oba et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Oba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolores Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Creany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony DeCesaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lou Archuletta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvette Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Tessiere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Raemisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellie Wasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?