Bradshaw v. Berkibile
Petitioner: Joseph Bradshaw
Respondent: D. Berkibile
Case Number: 1:2013cv02909
Filed: October 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying Applicant's Motions for 17 Recusal and 16 Reconsideration. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/18/2014.(klyon, )
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 14 Motion for Reconsideration. by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/3/2014.(trlee, )
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER dismissing this action, and denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/3/13. (dkals, )
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Applicant To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/24/13. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradshaw v. Berkibile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D. Berkibile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?