Perez v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Margaret E. Perez
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2013cv02914
Filed: October 25, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 [Second] Motion for Approval of Attorney's Fees, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/16/2015. IT IS ORDERED that attorney fees be granted in the amount of $7,941.00, which represents 25% of the past due benefits awarded to the Plaintiff, to Joseph A. Whitcomb, Esq.(slibi, )
September 15, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 26 Motion for Approval of Attorney Fees by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/14/2015.(mdave, )
October 29, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Final JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Margaret E. Perez against Carolyn W. Colvin re: 24 Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/29/2014. (slibi, )
April 22, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 6/30/2014. SS Defendants Brief due by 7/24/2014. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 8/8/2014 by Judge John L. Kane on 04/22/14. (jhawk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret E. Perez
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Whitcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?