Warren Produce Co., LLC v. Federal Fruit and Produce Co. et al

Plaintiff: Warren Produce Co., LLC
Defendant: Francis Mike Martelli, Stanley J. Kouba, Federal Fruit and Produce Co., Michael K. Bresson and John L. Domenico
Intervenor_plaintiff: Grimmway Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Grimmway Farms and RPE, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv02941
Filed: October 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/27/13. (dkals, )
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/12/13: Grimmway Enterprises, Inc. and RPE, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. (dkals, ) Modified on 12/12/2013 to add text (dkals, ).
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting for 2/13/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401, before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/14/13. (dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren Produce Co., LLC v. Federal Fruit and Produce Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Mike Martelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley J. Kouba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Fruit and Produce Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael K. Bresson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Domenico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Produce Co., LLC
Represented By: Craig Alan Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Grimmway Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Grimmway Farms
Represented By: Steven E. Nurenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: RPE, Inc.
Represented By: Steven E. Nurenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?