Turner v. Falk et al
Plaintiff: Gary Wayne Turner
Defendant: Dummit, Sharp, Robert Butcher, Frances Falk, Jackson and Steven Gossett
Case Number: 1:2013cv02957
Filed: October 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Final Judgment. ORDERED that judgment is hereby entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiff. ORDERED that, within 14 days of the entry of judgment, defendants may have their costs by filing a bill of costs with the Clerk of the Court. ORDERED that this case is dismissed in its entirety by Clerk on 12/31/14. (jhawk, )
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 46 Motion Requesting Subpoena by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 06/26/14.(jhawk, )
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. ORDERED that the Recommendation of Magistrate Judge [Docket No. 45] isACCEPTED. ORDERED that plaintiff's claims against Ms. Dummit, Teacher I are DISMISSED without prejudice by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 05/27/14.(jhawk, )
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 36 Defendants Falk, Butcher, Jackson, and Infante's Motion to Stay Discovery and Vacate the Scheduling Conference. This matter is STAYED pending resolution of the pending motion to dismiss 34 . Scheduling Conference 4/14/2014 01:30 PM is vacated. Show Cause Hearing set 4/14/2014 1:30 PM will go forward as scheduled. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/7/2014.(emill)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Status Conference for Pro Se Plaintiff on 2/10/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/9/14. (mnfsl, )
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Plaintiff To File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/2/13. (nmmsl, )
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/30/13. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Falk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dummit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Gossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Wayne Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?