LuxeYard, Inc. v. Bell et al
Plaintiff: Khaled Alattar
Defendant: Christopher Bell, Aaron Bell, Rachel Bell and William Bell
Case Number: 1:2013cv02990
Filed: October 31, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER REOPENING CASE and Certifying Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/30/14. (dkals, )
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER adopting 83 Report and Recommendations, granting 21 Motion to Dismiss, and denying 39 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint, by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/29/14.(dkals, )
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/6/14. (sgrim)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c)(1) Pending Determination of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint 34 is DENIED and Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Deposition of Defendant Maury Bell 33 is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff may conduct the deposition of Defendant William Bell subject to the notice provisions of Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR. 30.1, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/5/14.(sgrim)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 43 Motion to Intervene by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/30/14.(dkals, )
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUE ORDER. Motion for Protective Order 25 is DENIED without prejudice, and the proposed Protective Order is REFUSED, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/11/14.(sgrim)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/11/14. Text Only Entry (msksec, )
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Original Complaint and 12 Motion to Dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/7/2014.(klyon, )
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 2/11/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/15/13. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LuxeYard, Inc. v. Bell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khaled Alattar
Represented By: Christopher Kevin Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?