Dalton v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Josie Dalton
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2013cv02999
Filed: November 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Motion for Attorney Fees. ORDERED that the Defendant pay to Plaintiff, through counsel, reasonable attorney fees and expenses in the amount of $5, 150.00 by Judge John L. Kane on 08/19/14.(jhawk, )
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINAL JUDGMENT. Ordered that Accordingly, final judgment is hereby entered in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 58, consistent with the United States Supreme Court's decision in Shalala v. Schaefer, 509 U.S. 292, 296-302 (1993). Ordered that Plaintiff may have her costs upon the filing of a Bill of Costs within fourteen days of entry of judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1 by Clerk on 07/18/14. (jhawk, )
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 4/21/2014. SS Defendants Brief due by 5/21/2014. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 6/5/2014 by Judge John L. Kane on 02/24/14. (jhawk, )
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff To File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/4/13. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalton v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josie Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?