Novas v. School District No.1 in the City and County of Denver, State of Colorado
Plaintiff: Anna Novas
Defendant: School District No. 1 in The City and County of Denver, State of Colorado, Trent Sharp and Scott Barnes
Case Number: 1:2013cv03035
Filed: November 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 89 Motion to Dismiss. the Court hereby ORDERS that the claims and causes of action asserted by Plaintiff against all Defendants are in all respects DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall pay their own costs and fees. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/10/2015.(cthom, )
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER setting case for trial: Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/20/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. A four day jury Trial is set to commence on 12/14/2015, at 9:00 AM before Judge Raymond P. Moore, in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/4/2014. (tscha, )
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/5/14. (sgrim)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Motion Correct Case Caption. The caption shall be amended to change the Plaintiff's name to Ana Novas, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/20/14.(sgrim)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/28/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/15/13. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novas v. School District No.1 in the City and County of Denver, State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Novas
Represented By: Cathy L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: School District No. 1 in The City and County of Denver, State of Colorado
Represented By: Susanne Naomi Starecki Kim
Represented By: Holly Eileen Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Sharp
Represented By: Susanne Naomi Starecki Kim
Represented By: Holly Eileen Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Barnes
Represented By: Susanne Naomi Starecki Kim
Represented By: Holly Eileen Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?