Graham et al v. Sterling Trust Company
Plaintiff: Donna Graham, Maria Burke, Maria (I) Burke and Donna (I) Graham
Defendant: Sterling Trust Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv03046
Filed: November 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 33 Motion to Alter Judgment. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/9/14.(jdyne, )
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss for improper venue, and hereby dismisses the case without prejudice. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/11/2014.(trlee, )
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a five-day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on March 16, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for March 2, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 03/24/2014. (rbjsec.)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/14/2013. (rbjsec. )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham et al v. Sterling Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Graham
Represented By: Paul Leo Vorndran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Burke
Represented By: Paul Leo Vorndran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria (I) Burke
Represented By: Paul Leo Vorndran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna (I) Graham
Represented By: Paul Leo Vorndran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Trust Company
Represented By: Theodore A. B. McCombs
Represented By: Tamir I. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?