Jordan v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: |
Aaron Jordan |
Defendant: |
Hawkins, Ryan M. Smith and Movie Tavern/City of Aurora |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv03063 |
Filed: |
November 12, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Adams |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert E. Blackburn |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael J. Watanabe |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 9, 2014 |
Filing
57
Final JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 56 Order, by Clerk on 6/9/2014. (klyon, )
|
March 18, 2014 |
Filing
48
MINUTE ORDER: Denying 43 plaintiff's Motion to Suspend Litigation Due to Inability to Proceed Correctly. Plaintiff shall have up to and including 4/1/2014 to file response to Aurora Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted 38 . By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/18/2014.(mjwcd)
|
January 28, 2014 |
Filing
32
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Motions Hearing / Scheduling Conference held on 1/28/2014. Granting 23 Aurora Defendants' Motion to Clarify. Caption is corrected to list Mo vie Tavern and City of Aurora as 2 separate defendants. Granting 25 Aurora Defendants' Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Entry of Appearance. Deadline for Plaintiff to file Response to Aurora Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Officer H awkins and to Recaption Case 27 is 2/21/2014. The Court's Minute Order 22 is vacated; Plaintiff's Motion for Jury Demand 20 is accepted as a pending motion, and is Granted. Discovery due by 7/28/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 8/2 7/2014. Show Cause Hearing / Status Conference set for 4/8/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Parties shall file Scheduling Order in its final form for the Court's signature on or before 2/4/2014, nunc pro tunc 1/28/2014. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (mjwcd)
|
January 6, 2014 |
Filing
22
MINUTE ORDER striking 20 Motion for Jury Demand. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/6/2014.(klyon, )
|
December 23, 2013 |
Filing
19
MINUTE ORDER denying 16 [Motion] Designation of Record on Appeal and denying 17 [Motion] for Post-Trial Relief. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/23/2013.(klyon, )
|
November 12, 2013 |
Filing
4
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS Status Conference set for 12/16/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/12/2013. (mjwcd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?