Murphy et al v. Lenderlive Network Inc

Plaintiff: Dorothy Murphy and Heather Creazzo
Defendant: LenderLive Network, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv03135
Filed: November 18, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:2101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2015 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF THE WARN SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES, AND SERVICE AWARDS. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 09/02/2015. (athom, )
July 22, 2015 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 166 MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF THE FLSA SETTLEMENT AND APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES AND SERVICE AWARDS filed by Heather Creazzo, Dorothy Murphy. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/22/15. (jdyne, )
July 16, 2015 165 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Fairness Hearing held on 7/16/2015. 156 Plaintiffs' Motion for Certification of the WARN Settlement Class, Final Approval of the WARN Settlement, and Approva l of the FLSA Settlement is MOOT. 158 Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses is MOOT. 160 Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Service Awards is MOOT. New form of orders to be submitted. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (jdyne, )
June 8, 2015 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re-Setting Final Fairness Hearing Date and Approving Amended Notices to Warn Class. The Final Fairness Hearing is reset to 7/16/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 06/08/2015. (athom, )
June 2, 2015 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Addendum, Certification of the Settlement Class, Appointment of Plaintiffs' Counsel as Class Counsel, and Approval of Plaintiffs' Proposed Notice of Settlement. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 06/02/2015. (athom, )
November 6, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER : Granting in part and denying in part 67 Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Depositions. Granting in part and denying in part 82 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order. Settlement Conference 11/12/2014 01:30 PM is vacated. Denying as moot 74 Plaintiffs' Motion to Appear by Telephone at Settlement Conference. Scheduling Order 21 is amended. Discovery due by 11/26/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/6/2014.(emill)
October 22, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to Certify Class with class notice to be amended in a manner consistent with this opinion; denying as moot 34 Motion to Stay; denying 39 Motion for Summary Judgment. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/22/14.(jdyne, ) Modified on 10/22/2014 to correct docket text (jdyne, ).
October 17, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion for Conditional Certification and Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/17/14.(jdyne, )
October 15, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/15/2014. (trlee, )
February 20, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a three day bench trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on April 13, 2015 at 9:00 a.m.A Trial Preparation Conference is set for March 6, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 02/20/2014. (rbjsec. )
November 20, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE:. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/20/2013. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy et al v. Lenderlive Network Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Murphy
Represented By: Jack A. Raisner(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Rene S. Roupinian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Creazzo
Represented By: Jack A. Raisner(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Rene S. Roupinian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LenderLive Network, Inc.
Represented By: Bronwyn H. Pepple
Represented By: Charles William Weese, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?