Archer v. Perakos
Petitioner: Daniel Archer
Respondent: Alexis Perakos
Case Number: 1:2013cv03139
Filed: November 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:1101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Daniel Archer against Alexis Perakos re: 26 Order, by Clerk on 2/25/2014. (klyon, )
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying 19 Claimant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Verified Petition for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability [# 1 ], filed November 19, 2013, is DENIED. The injunction entered pursuant to this courts Order 1 at 2 [# 16 ], filed January 3, 2014, is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED in its entirety. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/24/2014.(klyon, )
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Joint Motion To Stay Deadlines and Requirements Arising Under F.R.C.P. 16 and 26. The deadlines and requirements arising under F.R.C.P. 16 and 26 are STAYED pending order of the court on Claimant's Motion For Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Motion To Dissolve Injunction [# 19 ]. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/7/2014.(klyon, )
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: As provided by and in accordance with Supplemental Rule F(3), furtherprosecution of any and all other suits, proceedings, or claims against plaintiff, the owner of the unnamed vessel, Hull ID #SERA5032J798, or plaintiff's property, arisin g from the voyage of said vessel on 6/19/2011, of whatever nature or description and in any court whatsoever, is ENJOINED until this matter is heard and determined. As provided by and in accordance with Supplemental Rule F(4), all persons asserting c laims against plaintiff, the owner of the unnamed vessel, Hull ID #SERA5032J798, or plaintiff's property, arising from the voyage of said vessel on 6/19/2011, SHALL FILE their respective claims in this matter and SHALL SERVE on the attorney for plaintiff a copy thereof by 2/3/2014. As provided by and in accordance with Supplemental Rule F(4), plaintiff SHALL PUBLISH notice of this Order once a week for four successive weeks in The Denver Post prior to 2/3/2014. As provided by and in accorda nce with Supplemental Rule F(4), not later than the date of the second publication contemplated in paragraph 3 above, plaintiff SHALL MAIL a copy of the notice to every person known to have made any claim against the unnamed vessel, Hull ID #SERA5032J798, or plaintiff's property, arising from the voyage of said vessel on 6/19/2011. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/3/2014. (klyon, )
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER to Deposit Surety Bond. By 12/24/2013, plaintiff SHALL DEPOSIT into the registry of the court, as security for a sum equal to plaintiff's interestin the vessel together with costs, a surety bond in the amount of $25,000.00, together with interest thereon at a rate of 6% per annum, from the date of the bond. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/17/2013. (klyon, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archer v. Perakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Archer
Represented By: Teri L. Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alexis Perakos
Represented By: Keith Malcolm Edwards
Represented By: Christopher Wallace Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?