Big Cats of Serenity Springs, Inc. et al v. Vilsack et al
Plaintiff: Big Cats of Serenity Springs, Inc., Nick Sculac, Julie Walker and Jules Investment, Inc.
Defendant: Thomas J. Vilsack, Cindy Rhodes and Tracy Thompson
Case Number: 1:2013cv03275
Filed: December 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE, 61 Defendants' Motion To Stay Proceedings is Granted. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/23/2015. (mlace, )
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/8/15. (lgale, )
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/28/15. A combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference is set for 2/5/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. A Jury Trial is set for 2/22/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (dkals, )
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER ADOPTING 49 RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Plaintiff's 47 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is granted. The proposed Second Amended Complaint for Damages, Declaratory Judgment, and Other Relief [#47-2] and its attendant exhibits [#47-3 - 47-8] are accepted for filing. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/11/2015. (alowe)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ADOPTING 40 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Defendants' 41 Objections to the Recommendation of U.S. Magistrate Judge are overruled. Defendants' 23 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted insofar as it seeks dismissal of the declaratory judgment claims to the extent they are asserted by the non-licensee plaintiffs, who lack standing to pursue such claims, and those claims are dismissed with prejudice and in all other respects, the motion is denied. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/25/2015. (alowe)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER granting 43 Motion for Leave To File a Reply to Their Objections by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/12/15.(dkals, )
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 30 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference. All discovery is STAYED pending resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [# 23 ]. The Scheduling Conference set for June 27, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/27/20144.(klyon, )
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Motion to Reset the Scheduling Conference and for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. All Defendants shall respond to the First Amended Complaint [# 15 ] on or before May 1, 2014. The Scheduling Conference set for April 29, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to June 27, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom C-204 of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall submit the proposed scheduling order no later than June 20, 2014. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/15/2014.(klyon, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Big Cats of Serenity Springs, Inc. et al v. Vilsack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Cats of Serenity Springs, Inc.
Represented By: Duston K. Barton
Represented By: Leonard H. MacPhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Sculac
Represented By: Duston K. Barton
Represented By: Leonard H. MacPhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Walker
Represented By: Duston K. Barton
Represented By: Leonard H. MacPhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jules Investment, Inc.
Represented By: Duston K. Barton
Represented By: Leonard H. MacPhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Vilsack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?