Securities and Exchange Commission v. Coddington et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Daniel Dirk Coddington, Michael B. Columbia, Jesse W. Erwin, Jr., Merlyn Curt Geisler, Marshall D. Gunn, Jr., Seth A. Leyton, Lewis P. Malouf, Extreme Capital Ltd., Fidelity Asset Services Corp., Geisco FNF, LLC, Golden Summit Investors Group Ltd., SouthCom Management LLC, Stonerock Capital Group LLC, Daniel Scott Coddington, Coddington Family Trust, Joanna I. Columbia, Vincent G. Farris and Vincent G. Farris Co., L.P.A.
Case Number: 1:2013cv03363
Filed: December 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 10
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and for Relief from Judgment Against Lewis P. Malouf (Doc. # 300 ) is DENIED, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/22/2021.(evana, )
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Lewis P. Malouf 249 . ORDERED that Lewis P. Malouf's Objections to the Securities and Exchange Commissions Appendix of Exhibits Submitted in Support of its Motion fo r Summary Judgment (Doc. # 261) is OVERRULED. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Against Lewis P. Malouf (Doc. # 249) is GRANTED. Summary judgment shall enter in favor of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission and against Defendant Lewis P. Malouf on Plaintiff's First Claim for Relief for engaging in the unregistered offer and sale of securities in violation of Sections 5(a) and (c) of the Securities Act; its Second and Third Claims for Relief for securities fraud in viola tion of Section 17(a) of the Securities Act and Section 10(b) of the Exchange Act and Rule 10b-5 thereunder; and its Fourth Claim for Relief for acting as an unregistered broker/dealer in violation of Section 15(a) of the Securities Act. Mr. Malouf is hereby ORDERED to pay $76,584.00 in disgorgement, $29,313.63 in prejudgment interest, and a third-tier civil penalty of $76,584.00, totaling $182,481.63. Judgment shall enter against Mr. Malouf in the amount of $182,481.63. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/25/2021.(swest)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Against D. Scott Coddington (Doc. # 251 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. It is GRANTED with respect to the $45,000 in cash gifts and $21,738.57 in tuition payments. It is DENIED as to the $120,509.10 in cash withdrawals from the Coddington Family Trust bank account, the $108,000 in disputed "salary" payments, and the $28,000 car loan. The Commission's request for prejudgment interest is DENI ED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as it is better suited for post-trial resolution; Relief Defendant Scott Coddington's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. # 253 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. It is GRANTED as to the $120,509.10 in cash w ithdrawals from the Coddington Family Trust bank account. It is DENIED in all other respects; summary judgment shall enter in favor of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission and against Relief Defendant D. Scott Coddington on Plaintiff' s claim for disgorgement with respect to the $45,000 in cash gifts and $21,738.57 in tuition payments only; summary judgment shall enter in favor of Relief Defendant D. Scott Coddington on Plaintiffs claim for disgorgement with respect t o the $120,509.10 in cash withdrawals from the Coddington Family Trust bank account only; Relief Defendant D. Scott Coddington is hereby ORDERED to pay $66,738.57 in disgorgement; and the parties shall inform the Court, by email sent to Arguello_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov by August 20, 2021, of how many days they will require to try the Commission's remaining claim for disgorgement against Scott Coddington, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/10/2021.(evana, )
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER Granting 240 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Jesse W. Erwin, Jr. Summary Judgment shall enter in favor of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission and against Defendant Jesse W. Erwin, Jr., on Plaintiff' ;s Second Claim for Relief for fraud in violation of Section 17(a) of the Securities Act, 15 U.S.C. § 77q(a), and Plaintiff's Third Claim for Relief for fraud in violation of Section 10(b) and Rule 10b-5 of the Exchange Act, 15 U.S.C. § ; 78j(b) and 17 C.F.R. § 240.10b-5; Mr. Erwin is hereby ENJOINED from further violations of the securities laws; and Mr. Erwin is ORDERED to pay $1,452,409.62 in disgorgement and $554,222.27 in prejudgment interest, but this obligation is subsumed within Mr. Erwin's existing restitution obligation in the related criminal action -- United States v. Erwin, Case No. 15-cr-00383-RBJ-2. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/29/2021.(swest)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER that the Courts December 11, 2020 Order is hereby AMENDED at pages 8, 9, and 11 to substitute the correct amount of $2,257,183.15 for any amount listed as $2,256,765.35. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter an Amended Default Judgment that corrects the total amounts on pages 2 and 3 to be $2,257,183.15, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/16/2020.(evana, )
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 283 OPINION AND ORDER Granting Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendant Seth A. Leyton. ORDERED: The SEC's Motion for Default Judgment against Seth A. Leyton 254 is GRANTED. Defendant Leyton is liable for disgorgement for a total amount of &# 036;423,302.73. The Clerk of Court is ordered to enter Judgment in favor of the SEC and against Defendant Seth A. Leyton in the amount of $423,302.73. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over this matter for the purposes of enforcing the terms of the Final Judgment. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/11/2020.(swest)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER Adopting 239 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Motion to Strike Answer of Coddington Family Trust (Doc. # 234 ) is GRANTED. Coddington Family Trust's Answer (Doc. # 52 ) is hereby STRICKEN. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter default against Coddington Family Trust, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 09/15/2020. (athom, )
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 176 COURTROOM MIINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 1/20/2016 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Coddington Defendants' Joint Expediated Motion for Stay of Proceedings or, in the Alternative, Protective Order 164 is GRANTED, as stated on record. Discovery is STAYED, pending further Court order. Defendants' Motion to Stay Further Briefing and Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Coddington Defendants' Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of the Securi ties and Exchange Commission and for Protective Order or, in the Alternative, for Extension of Time to Respond 165 is DENIED AS MOOT. Defendant Jesse Erwin's Motion for Stay of Proceedings 166 is GRANTED, as stated on record. Discovery is STAYED, pending further Court order. The parties shall file a status report within five days upon resolution of the criminal case against Defendants Daniel Dirk Coddington or Jesse Erwin.FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER Granting Leave to Take Deposition of Seth Beoku-Betts, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/27/15.(morti, )
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting 138 Leave to Take Deposition of Michael Columbia, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/5/15.(sgrim)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Adopting and Affirming 101 March 4, 2015 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Doc. # 54 ) is DENIED. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/23/2015. (athom, )
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER. The Answer of Defendant Stonerock Capital Group LLC 12 is STRICKEN. Any further documents filed by Defendant Columbia on behalf of Defendant Stonerock Capital Group LLC will be stricken, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/15/14. (sgrim)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/10/2014 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/4/14. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Coddington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Leslie J. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Dirk Coddington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Columbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse W. Erwin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merlyn Curt Geisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall D. Gunn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth A. Leyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis P. Malouf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extreme Capital Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Asset Services Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisco FNF, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Summit Investors Group Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SouthCom Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonerock Capital Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Scott Coddington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coddington Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna I. Columbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent G. Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent G. Farris Co., L.P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?