Bok v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Catherine M. Bok
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2013cv03367
Filed: December 12, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/22/2014.(trlee, )
December 13, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/13/13. (dkals, )
December 30, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/4/2014, 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/30/2013. (trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bok v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine M. Bok
Represented By: Frances A. Koncilja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.