Bueno v. Timme et al
Petitioner: Joey Bueno
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The and Rae Timme
Case Number: 1:2013cv03401
Filed: December 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 21 Motion for Reconsideration. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/15/2014.(klyon, )
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER dismissing this action, and denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/11/14. No certificate of appealability will issue. (dkals, )
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss; accept for filing the Motion to Dismiss Habeas Application 14 , by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/29/2014.(skl)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/02/2014. (skl)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/18/2013. (skl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bueno v. Timme et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rae Timme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joey Bueno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?