Myers et al v. USA
Plaintiff: Katherine Myers and Walter Myers
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2013cv03443
Filed: December 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:2679
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 20 Joint Motion for Stay Pending the Court's Resolution of the Government's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/8/14.(dkals, )
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/23/14. (msksec, )
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/22/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/28/14. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Myers
Represented By: Randall M. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Myers
Represented By: Randall M. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?