Porter v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Daniel L Porter
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv03446
Filed: December 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Mesa
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Daniel L Porter against American Family Mutual Insurance Company entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/18/16. (rkeec)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/16/16. (rkeec)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MINUTE ORDER granting 139 Motion for Leave. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 02/12/2016. (athom, )
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Wiley Y. Daniel: Jury Trial (Day 3) held on 2/10/2016. Granting in part and denying in part as outlined by the Court on the record 80 Motion in Limine. Court Reporter: Mary George. (rkeec)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER; 119 Plaintiffs Second Motion to Amend Pre-Trial Order and Exhibit List of Plaintiff is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/7/16.(morti, )
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER that the 71 Order of the United States Magistrate Judge, dated June 4, 2015, is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED and Defendants Objection ECF No. 73 is rejected. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Reconsideration ECF No. 107 is hereby DENIED as moot. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion hearing scheduled for Tuesday, December 8, 2015 regarding this motion is hereby VACATED, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/1/2015.(evana, )
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Wiley Y. Daniel: Motion Hearing held on 11/23/2015. Denying without prejudice 79 Motion in Limine. Status Report due by 1/11/2016. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1002 before Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Court Reporter: Darlene Martinez. (rkeec)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 VACATED Minute ORDER striking 77 Motion in Limine; striking 78 Motion in Limine; striking 79 Motion in Limine; striking 80 Motion in Limine. Parties are reminded to review all of the Practice Standards as they pertain to trial preparation, and to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1 for all motions submitted to this Court. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/17/15.(jhawk, ) Modified on 9/17/2015 vacated pursuant to the minute order of 09/17/15 (jhawk, ).
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying 41 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/23/2015.(evana, )
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 6/4/2015 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Supplemental Expert Disclosure and Surrebuttal Report of Giometti and Prohibit Testimony 52 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Second Supplemental Expert Disclosure and Surrebuttal Report of Taylor/Jacobson and Prohibit Testimony 54 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Amend Final Pretrial Order; Motion to Amend Exhibit List and Witness List of Plaintiff [Docket #49] 63 is GRANTED IN PART. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 9/11/2014 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Regarding Reserve Information 20 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, as stated on record. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Bodily Injury File of Defendant and for an Expedited Hearing 34 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, as stated on record. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/22/14. (sgrim)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/8/2014 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/9/14. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel L Porter
Represented By: Sander N. Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Debra K. Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?