Green Earth Wellness Center, LLC, The v. Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Green Earth Wellness Center, LLC , The
Defendant: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv03452
Filed: December 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion for Summary Judgment, 75 Motion to Determine Question of Law Regarding Application of Federal Law and Public Policy, and 77 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/17/16. 74 Motion to Determine Question of Law Regarding Legal Interpretation of Policy Provision is denied. An Interim Case Management Conference is set for 5/10/2016 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger. (dkals, )
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER granting 66 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Exhibits to Plaintiff's Previously Filed Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/10/15.(dkals, )
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held on 3/2/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Plaintiff Green Earth Wellness Center, LLC's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order (Doc. #22) and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (Doc. # 1) 53 is DENIED. Atain Specialty Insurance Company's Motion to Compel Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures and Discovery Responses 38 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff shall provide, no later than March 9, 2015, a supplement including a breakdown of items covered by the claimed losses that comprise Stock, through both a supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) disclosure and supplemental responses to Interrogatory Nos. 2-4. FTR: Courtroom C-205. (bsimm, )
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/30/14 granting 35 Motion to Amend. Discovery due by 10/31/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 11/28/2014. (bsimm, )
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/3/14. (msksec, )
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER re: 8 Order. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/9/2014. (trlee, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Earth Wellness Center, LLC, The v. Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Earth Wellness Center, LLC , The
Represented By: Robert Dale Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atain Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Melissa A. Ogburn
Represented By: Adam Michael Royval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?