Carbajal v. Brandy et al
Petitioner: Dean Carbajal
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The and Lind Brandy
Case Number: 1:2013cv03484
Filed: December 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Crowley
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 19 Order, by Clerk on 5/30/2014. (klyon, ) (Main Document 20 replaced on 5/30/2014) (klyon, ). Modified on 5/30/2014 to replace PDF with Judgment, not Order (klyon, ).
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/07/2014. (slibi, )
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING APPLICANT TO CURE DEFICIENCY: Applicant shall cure the deficiency designated within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Applicant files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. If Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiency within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/6/2014. (mehcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carbajal v. Brandy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lind Brandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dean Carbajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?