Bristol v. El Paso County Sheriff Dep. et al
Plaintiff: Tommy Wayne Bristol
Defendant: El Paso County Sheriff Dep., State of Colorado, C. Mott and N. Nuncio
Case Number: 1:2014cv00012
Filed: January 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER adopting 64 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge and denying as moot 60 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. This matter is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/30/2015. (cpear)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/23/15 re: 60 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. 36) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b) (6). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before April 13, 2015, Plaintiff shall file a Response to the Motion. (lgale, )
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 28 Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED that pages 2-53 of the Letter 20 are accepted for filing as Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/24/2014.(tscha, )
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to a Presiding Judge. Claim two asserted against the State of Colorado is dismissed. Remaining claims one, three, and four and the case are drawn to a presiding judge and, if appropriate, to a magistrate judge. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/1/2014. (klyon, )
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting 13 (Motion) Request for Copies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/11/2014.(slibi, )
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint; denied as premature request for appointment of counsel, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/10/2014. (slibi, )
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/02/2014. (skl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bristol v. El Paso County Sheriff Dep. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Wayne Bristol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso County Sheriff Dep.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Nuncio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?