Franco v. Nealy et al
Plaintiff: David M Franco
Defendant: Larry Nealy, Interpid, LLC, James M Jacobsen and Bearing Consulting Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv00105
Filed: January 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STAY ORDER Pursuant to Plaintiff's Status Report 79 , the claims against Defendant Nealy are stayed pending resolution of the Nealy bankruptcy proceedings, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/15/16. (ktera)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER FOR STATUS REPORT On or before March 15, 2016, the plaintiff shall file a status report, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/25/16. (ktera)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER The Motion for Sanctions, 64 , is DENIED, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/16/15. (ktera)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 JUDGMENT by Clerk This civil action is dismissed as to Defendant James M. Jacobsen and Defendant Bearing Consulting Group, LLC. Defendants Jacobsen and Bearing Consulting Group, LLC, are awarded costs upon the filing of a bill of costs within 14 days, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/22/15. (ktera)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 52 Motion for leave to withdraw filed by William Meyer, Howard Gelt and Polsinelli P.C., on April 15, 2015, and the 55 motion for leave to withdraw filed by Annika K. Vanghagen, on April 28, 2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/1/15. (ktera)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 Motion for Leave to Amend Answer to Add Affirmative Defense, and accepts Larry Nealy's Amended Answer attached thereto as filed as of the date of this Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/30/2014.(jsmit)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/30/2014 02:30 PM in Conference Room, before Judge Richard P. Matsch, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/22/14. (dkals, )
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER TO COMPLY WITH D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2: in all court filings, as to any information to be submitted under restriction based on the 36 Protective Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/1/2014. (jsmit)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/18/2014 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on September 11, 2014, lead counsel present in person, initial disclosure s under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, and defendant's Intrepid, LLC, and Bearing Consulting Group, LLC, shall file respective disclosure statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/1/2014. (jsmit)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER For Status Report due by 8/14/2014, plaintiff shall file a status report concerning proceedings against the defendants James M. Jacobsen and Bearing Consulting Group, LLC, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/25/2014. (jsmit)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Denying 10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; and denying 13 Motion to Dismiss, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/13/2014.(jsmit )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franco v. Nealy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M Franco
Represented By: David S. Douglas
Represented By: Ronald Harry Nemirow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Nealy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interpid, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bearing Consulting Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?