Spring Creek Exploration & Production Company, LLC v. Hess Bakken Invenstment II, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Spring Creek Exploration & Production Company, LLC
Defendant: Hess Bakken Investment II, LLC, Statoil Oil & Gas LP and Statoil US Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00134
Filed: January 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER. ORDERED that the parties' Agreed Motion to Dismiss Existing Lease Claims Without Prejudice 367 is granted in part. ORDERED that plaintiffs' first and second claims for relief for breach of contract claims for past damages agains t Hess and Statoil, see Docket No. 80 at 8-9, are dismissed without prejudice. ORDERED that the trial preparation conference scheduled for January 6, 2017 and the trial scheduled to commence on January 23, 2017 are vacated. ORDERED that defendan ts' Unopposed Motion to Continue the Trial on the Existing Lease Claims, and Rule 54(B) Certification as Final Judgment of All the New Lease Claims 366 is denied as moot. ORDERED that this case is closed. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/15/16. (jhawk, )
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER; 163 Hess Bakken Investment II, LLC (Hess Bakken) and Statoil Oil & Gas, L.P. (Statoil) Motion to Strike the Rebuttal Expert Report of Rick Chamberlain and Adrian Reed" is DENIED, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/21/16.(morti, )
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER. ORDERED that defendant Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Working Interest Damages 81 is GRANTED. ORDERED that, at trial, plaintiffs Spring Creek Exploration and ProductionCompany, LLC and Gold Coast Energy LLC will not be permitted to present evidence of the value of any working interests that they may have acquired had they not entered into, or treated as rescinded, the contract at issue in this case. ORDERED that, pursuant to the Court&# 039;s Order dated September 5, 2014 (Docket No. 48), plaintiffs' third, fourth, fifth, and sixth claims for relief, as well as the portion of plaintiffs' first claim for relief that alleges previously-dismissed breach of contract theories, are stricken. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/24/16.(jhawk, )
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Minute ORDER denying 116 Motion to Strike for Failure to Comply with Judge Brimmer's Practice Standards. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 07/14/15.(jhawk, )
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER. ORDERED that plaintiff Spring Creek Exploration & Production Company, LLC's Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Portions of the Court's Order Granting in Part and Dismissing in Part the Defendants Motions to Dismiss 52 is DENIED. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 06/05/15.(jhawk, )
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE ORDER granting 77 Motion to Intervene as an Additional Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Amended Complaint and Jury Demand attached to Gold Coast's Motion. (Doc. No. 77-1.). Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint no later than May 12, 2015. Discovery due by 9/10/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 10/8/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/30/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/7/2015 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Entered by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/28/15.(jhawk, )
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 74 Motion to Intervene as an Additional Plaintiff. Entered by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/17/15.(jhawk, )
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants Statoil and Hess Bakken's Motions to DismissPursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) [Docket Nos. 7 and 13] are each GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. ORDERED that Plaintiffs third, fourth, fifth and sixth claims for relief are dismissed with prejudice by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/05/14.(jhawk, )
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/29/14. (sgrim)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER of Dismissal granting the 30 Stipulated Motion Regarding Statoil Oil & Gas, LP's and Statoil US Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to DismissWithdrawing Portions of the Motion and Dismissing Defendant Statoil US Holdings Inc. All claims against defendant Statoil US Holdings, Inc. are DISMISSED without prejudice. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/6/2014.(klyon, )
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 4/10/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/13/14. (sgrim)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/17/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/5/14. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spring Creek Exploration & Production Company, LLC v. Hess Bakken Invenstment II, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spring Creek Exploration & Production Company, LLC
Represented By: Tamir I. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Bakken Investment II, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Jeanelia Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Statoil Oil & Gas LP
Represented By: Alexis Juan Gomez
Represented By: Frank Christopher Porada
Represented By: Michelle Prejean Scheffler
Represented By: Craig L. Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Statoil US Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Alexis Juan Gomez
Represented By: Frank Christopher Porada
Represented By: Michelle Prejean Scheffler
Represented By: Craig L. Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?