A.B. v. City of Woodland Park, The et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ybarra
Defendant: City of Woodland Park, The, Christopher Moeller, Andrew Leibbrand, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Seth Shelton, Melissa Young, Christopher (I) Moeller and Andrew (I) Leibrand
Case Number: 1:2014cv00151
Filed: January 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER denying as moot 70 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 21 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 03/29/2016.(cthom, )
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 12/8/2015 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: The Walmart Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Disclosures and Trial Exhibit 14 106 is GRANTED. Trial Exhibit 14 is inadmissible. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER 8 day Jury Trial set for 9/12/2016, first day of trial will start at 8:30am, after the first day the remaining trial days will begin at 9:00am, in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/5/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 09/25/2015. (cthom, ) Modified to correct text on 9/25/2015 (cthom, )
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 6/2/2015 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: A.B.'s Motion to Reopen Discovery and Revise or Replace Expert Witness Report 86 is GRANTED for the limited purpose of deposing Thoma s Kinney and Eric Zachareas and supplementing expert reports with respect to the newly disclosed measurement data, if necessary. Depositions shall be completed on or before June 30, 2015. Supplementation of expert reports by the parties shall be due on or before July 31, 2015, as discussed. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim) Modified on 6/2/2015 to correct date filed. (sgrim)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/12/15. (sgrim)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 5/13/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/18/14. (sgrim)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/24/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/28/14. (sgrim)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER amending caption. by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/22/2014. (trlee, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.B. v. City of Woodland Park, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ybarra
Represented By: Matthew John Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Woodland Park, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Moeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Leibbrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher (I) Moeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew (I) Leibrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?