Ramirez v. Cooke et al
Plaintiff: Joe Ramirez
Defendant: Sterling Geesaman, Jack McGrath, John Cooke and Gregory Broswell
Case Number: 1:2014cv00171
Filed: January 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 JUDGMENT in favor of Gregory Broswell, Jack McGrath, John Cooke, Sterling Geesaman against Joe Ramirez re: 45 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Report and Recommendations, by Clerk on 12/29/2014. (tscha, )
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/22/2014. Granting 30 Motion to Amend Complaint. Defendants' Oral Motion to Withdraw Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint is granted. Withdrawing 24 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants have 10 calendar days from today's date to file a new motion to dismiss. Granting 25 Motion to Stay Discovery. FTR: Courtroom A402. (eseam)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a presiding judge and, when applicable, to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/04/2014. (slibi, )
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/22/2014. (skl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Cooke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Geesaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Broswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?