Von Schwab et al v. AAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Carol Von Schwab and Ronald Von Schwab
Defendant: AAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Counter_claimant: AAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Counter_defendant: Carol Von Schwab and Ronald Von Schwab
Case Number: 1:2014cv00183
Filed: January 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 87 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this case are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, the parties to pay their own fees and costs. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 04/29/2015. (athom, )
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/21/15 granting 74 Motion for Protective Order and granting 76 Motion to Supplement. (bsimm, )
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/12/14 granting in part and denying in part Defendant's Motion for Protective Order 57 and granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Deadlines 61 . (bsimm, )
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying without prejudice 9 Motion for Summary Judgment. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 09/15/2014. (athom, )
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/02/2014. A Final Pretrial Order shall be prepared by the parties and submitted to the court no later than 04/07/2015. (athom, )
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 35 Motion for Protective Order; denying 22 Motion to Compel. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 07/15/2014. (athom, )
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/12/14 re: Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, Motion to Withdraw Pending Motion to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions Regarding Depositions, and State Report Regarding Discovery 30 . The Motion is GRANTED as follows: Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions 27 is DENIED AS WITHDRAWN. The motions hearing set for July 15, 2014, at 8:30 a.m., will go forward. The Scheduling Order is amended. (bsimm)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/26/14. Scheduling Conference set for 4/14/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. (Simmons, B.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Von Schwab et al v. AAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Von Schwab
Represented By: Keith Evan Frankl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Von Schwab
Represented By: Keith Evan Frankl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Evans Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: AAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Evans Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Carol Von Schwab
Represented By: Keith Evan Frankl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Ronald Von Schwab
Represented By: Keith Evan Frankl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?