Obermeyer Hydro Accessories, Inc. v. CSI Calendering, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Obermeyer Hydro Accessories, Inc.
Defendant: CSI Calendering, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00184
Filed: January 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART 160 plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Jeff Leach and GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART defendant's 161 Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures and Exclude Expert Testimony. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/8/2018. (cthom, )
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 112 Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment and for Approval of Bond by Obermeyer Hydro Accessories. The Court APPROVES the Supersedeas Bond and Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 62(d), execution on the Final Judgment, entered onMarch 9, 2016 108 , is STAYED pending resolution of Plaintiff Obermeyer HydroAccessories, Inc.s, d/b/a Obermeyer Hydro, Inc., appeal. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 04/01/2016.(cthom, )
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: Judgment shall enter in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff in the amount of $638,352.11 plus $71,096.85 in pre-judgment interest plus $6,443.50 in costs plus post-judgment interest as of 3/9/2016 in the amount of.66 percent per annum. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/9/2016. (cpear, )
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying 50 Motion to Exclude; denying 92 Motion in Limine; denying 93 Motion in Limine, all motions are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 02/23/2016.(cthom, )
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 47 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 60 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in re 59 Restricted Document. Summary judgment is granted in Defendant CSI Calendering, Incs favor as to liability with respect to Plaintiff Obermey er Hydro Accessories claims for breach of contract, promissory estoppel, money had and received, and unjust enrichment; and summary judgment is granted in Defendant CSI Calendering, Incs favor as to liability with respect to its breach of contract co unterclaim and its alternative unjust enrichment counterclaim. The sole issue remaining before this Court is that of damages. As the Court ordered at the status conference held in this matter on January 22, 2016, 97 , the parties are directed to file a joint status report on the issue of damages one week from the filing of the present order. Ordered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 01/27/2016. (cthom, )
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER setting case for trial. Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/22/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. A seven day Jury Trial is set to commence on 2/29/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Raymond P. Moore. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/23/2015. (tscha, )
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 18 Defendants motion to dismiss Claim Five in Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint ECF No. 18 ; and ORDERS that the matter will proceed on Claims One, Two, Three, and Four in Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint ECF No. 9 ( 49-71). by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/5/2015.(evana, )
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 43 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss the third claim for relief of defendant's counterclaim. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/18/2014.(tscha, )
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 COURTROOM MINUTES for Status Conference held on 9/3/2014 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines for Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings and to Set Matter for Scheduling Conference 35 is GRANTED. Discovery due by 2/18/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 3/18/2015. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/16/14. (sgrim)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/21/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/28/14. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obermeyer Hydro Accessories, Inc. v. CSI Calendering, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Obermeyer Hydro Accessories, Inc.
Represented By: Mark David Changaris
Represented By: Richard F. Greenleaf
Represented By: Daniel M. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSI Calendering, Inc.
Represented By: Reid A. Page
Represented By: Joy Christine Syrcle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?