Bruce v. Berkebile
Petitioner: Antoine Bruce
Respondent: David Berkebile
Case Number: 1:2014cv00194
Filed: January 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice, and denying leave to proceed in forma pampers on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/22/14. (dkals, )
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying in part and terminated in part 9 Motion; Respondent is directed to respond, within 7 days of the date of this Order, and state why Applicant was denied his request for the 28 U.S.C. § 2241 form for use in filing an Amended Appli cation in this action; Respondent immediately provide to Applicant the 28 U.S.C. § 2241 form; Applicant shall have an additional 30 days from the date Respondent responds to file an Amended Application, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/24/2014.(slibi, )
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Applicant to File Amended Application; denying as unnecessary 5 Applicant's Motion for Leave to File in Excess of Thirty Pages, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/24/2014.(skl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce v. Berkebile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Berkebile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antoine Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?