Boulter v. Greenauer Design Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Harvey Boulter
Defendant: Greenauer Design Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00204
Filed: January 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER granting 55 Unopposed Motion for a Temporary Stay of Proceedings to Facilitate Settlement Negotiations, up to and including 3/30/2015. Status Report due by 3/30/2015. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/29/2015.(emill)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 37 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Discovery Requests, as set forth in the Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/18/2014.(emill)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER granting 44 Greenauer Design Group Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Discovery Requests. Court's Minute Order 42 which granted the plaintiff's Motion to Compel is VACATED. Plaintiff shall have up to and including 11/13/2014, to file a reply in support of his Motion to Compel 37 . By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/30/2014.(emill)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 37 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Discovery Requests, as set forth in the Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/27/2014.(emill)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/12/2014. (emill)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/16/14. (msksec, )
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER : Granting 16 defendant's Motion to Withdraw or Dismiss as Moot Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; withdrawing 8 defendant's Motion to Dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/21/2014.(emill)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/4/2014. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boulter v. Greenauer Design Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Boulter
Represented By: Stephen C. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenauer Design Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?