Scott et al v. Lotus School for Excellence Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Heidi Anderson and Amanda P. Scott
Defendant: Lotus School for Excellence Inc. and Adnan Doyuran
Case Number: 1:2014cv00231
Filed: January 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Pursuant to the Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Doc. 33 filed April 13, 2015, it is ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/13/2015. (evana, )
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re: 31 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend the Discovery Cutoff and Dispositive Motion Deadlines by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 02/17/15.(jhawk, )
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 the parties Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Discovery Cutoff of Related Deadlines. The Discovery Cutoff within the Scheduling Order is now modified to and including March 9, 2015. Plaintiffs shall have up through and including January 19, 2015 to produce their discovery responses. Defendants shall have up through and including January 22, 2015 to produce their expert disclosures, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/23/2014.(evana, )
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO COMPLY WITH D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2: as to any information to be submitted under restriction based on the 27 Protective Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/13/2014. (jsmit)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Motion to Modify 16 Scheduling Order: Plaintiffs' Expert Disclosure deadline is extended to and including December 8, 2014, and the Defendants' rebuttal Expert Disclosure deadline is now January 8, 2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/30/2014. (jsmit )
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 Motion to Modify 16 Scheduling Order: The Plaintiffs' Expert Disclosure deadline is extended to and including November 6, 2014, and the Defendants rebuttal Expert Disclosure deadline is now December 8, 2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/24/2014.(jsmit)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Minute ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to Reset Scheduling Conference for 6/4/2014 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, and proposed scheduling order must be submitted in paper form directly to chambers by May 29, 2014, at 4:00 p.m., by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/14/2014.(jsmit)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/2/2014 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 24, 2014, lead counsel present in person, and initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference. Defendant Lotus School for Excellence, Inc., shall file a disclosure statement pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/14/2014. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott et al v. Lotus School for Excellence Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Anderson
Represented By: Ryan Stuart Coward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda P. Scott
Represented By: Ryan Stuart Coward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lotus School for Excellence Inc.
Represented By: Allison Joy Dodd
Represented By: J. Scott Lasater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adnan Doyuran
Represented By: Allison Joy Dodd
Represented By: J. Scott Lasater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?