Weinman v. Gibson et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Weinman
Defendant: Guy A. Gibson, Michael J. McCloskey, Jamie Yancy, Linda Selub, Cheryl Brady, Benjamin Hirsh, Theodore Abariotes, Michael Stallings, William Snyder, Lester Ravitz, Robert Slezak, James Bullock, Bernard Darre, Jeffrey R. Leeds, Richard A. Desich, Jr. and R & J Limited Partnership
Case Number: 1:2014cv00296
Filed: January 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:157
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Proceeding in Abeyance Pending Approval of Settlement (Doc. # 202 ) is GRANTED in part. The Clerk of the Court shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2. The Discovery Deadl ine of 3/31/2016; the Dispositive Motion Deadline of 4/29/2016; and the Final Pretrial Conference date of 7/12/2016, are hereby VACATED. The parties shall file with the Court either (1) a Motion to Dismiss within 10 days of the United States Bankruptcy Court's final Order approving settlement in Case 13-18184-EEB, OR (2) a joint status report every six months, beginning 9/1/2016. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/29/2016. (athom, )
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 10/5/2015. Finding as moot 158 Motion for Order. Parties shall file a status report by the end of this week indicating that all fact depositions are scheduled to be completed by 12/15/2015. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, )
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: IT IS ORDERED that defendants counsel have until 9/11/2015 to file briefs regarding the privilege issue. Plaintiffs counsel has until 9/18/2015 to file a response. No reply briefs will be accepted by the court. Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2015 03:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. 145 Joint Motion to Vacate Order Setting Deadlines is granted in part and denied in part. The fact deposition deadline of 9/21/2015 is VACATED and the remaining deadlines remain in effect. Status Conference held on 8/31/2015. FTR: Courtroom A 402. (mdave, )
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 134 Unopposed Motion to Partially Reconsider Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Director Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Paul Maxwell shall remain a Defendant in this matter. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 04/15/2015. (athom, )
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER. Directors' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 72 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Specifically, the Court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE the claims relating to the sale of the Viatical Business and the 2011 Distribution. The Court DENIES the Motion in all other respects. Defendants Theodore Abariotes and Paul E. Maxwell are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Bancorp shall be joined as a Defendant. If joinder is not feasible, the Trustee shall so inform the Court within 14 days of this Order and the Court will hold a Rule 19(b) hearing. Defendant UWBI Group LLC's ("UWBI's") Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) (Doc. # 126 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Specifically, the Court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE Plaintiff's claims against UWBI group arising under 11 U.S.C. § 544(b), and DENIES the Motion in all other respects. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/31/2015. (athom, )
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 11/18/2014. ORDERED: MOTION 103 to File Fourth Amended Complaint is GRANTED and is deemed as filed today. MOTION [96} of Defendants R&J Limited Partnership and Equity PartnershipHoldings, LLC for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(c) Pleadings is DENIED as MOOT. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/4/14. ORDERED that Defendant R&J Ltd. Partnership's 111 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that when filing documents under seal parties MUST fully comply with the requirements of D.C.ColoL.CivR. 7.2 and D.C.COLO. ECF. PROC. 5.1. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weinman v. Gibson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Weinman
Represented By: Mark Allan Larson
Represented By: Shelly C. Thompson
Represented By: Patrick D. Vellone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy A. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Yancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Selub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Hirsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Abariotes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Ravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Slezak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Darre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey R. Leeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Desich, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & J Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?