Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc v. Healing Touch International, Inc
Plaintiff: Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc and Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc doing business as Healing Touch Program
Defendant: Healing Touch International, Inc
Case Number: 1:2014cv00313
Filed: February 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Craig B Shaffer
Referring Judge: Michael J Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #89 Joint Motion to Dismiss Suit, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/21/2017. ORDERED that the instant suit is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (slibi, )
March 20, 2017 Filing 89 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Lineberger, Samira)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER re: #87 Notice of Settlement filed by Healing Touch International, Inc, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/01/2017. Dismissal Papers due on or before 3/20/2017. (slibi, )
March 1, 2017 Filing 87 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc (Morse, Stuart)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Witness List, #2 Plaintiff's Exhibit List, #3 Defendant's Witness List, #4 Defendant's Exhibit List) (slibi, )
February 22, 2017 Filing 85 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Final Pretrial Conference held on 2/22/2017. Bench Trial set for 3/14/2017 through 3/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Bench Trial set for 3/20/2017 through 3/24/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (slibi, )
February 15, 2017 Filing 84 Proposed Pretrial Order (JOINTLY FILED) by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document Plaintiff's Exhibit List, #2 Continuation of Main Document Plaintiff's Witness List, #3 Continuation of Main Document Defendant's Exhibit List, #4 Continuation of Main Document Defendant's Witness List)(Morse, Stuart)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/4/17. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/15/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (nmarb, )
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/3/17 DENYING #68 Motion in Limine; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #69 Motion in Limine; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #70 Motion in Limine; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #71 Motion in Limine; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #72 Motion in Limine; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #73 Motion in Limine. (nmarb, )
November 7, 2016 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to #71 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING HEARSAY STATEMENTS OF A DECEASED PARTY Reply in Support of Motion in limine re Colorado Dead Man's Statute filed by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Morse, Stuart)
November 7, 2016 Filing 80 REPLY to Response to #69 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY REGARDING DAMAGES PRIOR TO FEBRUARY 21, 2011 AND STRIKING PLAINTIFFS EXPERT OPINIONS ON ECONONMIC DAMAGES Reply in Support of Motion in limine re Damages and Expert Opinions filed by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Morse, Stuart)
November 7, 2016 Filing 79 REPLY to Response to #73 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY OF LAWYER JON KOTTKE PURSUANT TO THE ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE Reply in Support of Motion in limine re Kottke filed by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Morse, Stuart)
November 4, 2016 Filing 78 REPLY to Response to #72 MOTION in Limine filed by Plaintiff Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc. (Lineberger, Samira)
November 4, 2016 Filing 77 REPLY to Response to #70 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE AS TO WHAT MATERIALS ARE ACTUALLY REGISTERED AND RECEIVED COPYRIGHT PROTECTION BASED ON PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO DISCLOSE CERTIFICATES OF REGISTRATION AND AUTHENTIC DEPOSITS OF REGISTERE Reply in Support of Motion in limine re content of CCHT Original Works filed by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Morse, Stuart)
November 4, 2016 Filing 76 REPLY to Response to #68 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING ANY EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY IN SUPPORT OF ITS LANHAM ACT CLAIMS BASED ON THE APPLICATION OF LACHES Reply in Support of Motion in limine to preclude evidence and testimony based on laches filed by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Morse, Stuart)
October 24, 2016 Filing 75 RESPONSE to #73 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY OF LAWYER JON KOTTKE PURSUANT TO THE ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE, #68 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING ANY EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY IN SUPPORT OF ITS LANHAM ACT CLAIMS BASED ON THE APPLICATION OF LACHES, #70 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE AS TO WHAT MATERIALS ARE ACTUALLY REGISTERED AND RECEIVED COPYRIGHT PROTECTION BASED ON PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO DISCLOSE CERTIFICATES OF REGISTRATION AND AUTHENTIC DEPOSITS OF REGISTERE, #69 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY REGARDING DAMAGES PRIOR TO FEBRUARY 21, 2011 AND STRIKING PLAINTIFFS EXPERT OPINIONS ON ECONONMIC DAMAGES, #71 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING HEARSAY STATEMENTS OF A DECEASED PARTY filed by Plaintiff Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc. (Glade, Michael)
October 21, 2016 Filing 74 RESPONSE to #72 MOTION in Limine Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in limine filed by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Morse, Stuart)
September 30, 2016 Filing 73 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY OF LAWYER JON KOTTKE PURSUANT TO THE ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY OF LAWYER JON KOTTKE PURSUANT TO THE ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE)(Morse, Stuart)
September 30, 2016 Filing 72 MOTION in Limine by Plaintiff Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Glade, Michael)
September 30, 2016 Filing 71 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING HEARSAY STATEMENTS OF A DECEASED PARTY by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) 2016-09-30 Proposed Order Motion in limine re Dead Mans Statute jdk)(Morse, Stuart)
September 30, 2016 Filing 70 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE AS TO WHAT MATERIALS ARE ACTUALLY REGISTERED AND RECEIVED COPYRIGHT PROTECTION BASED ON PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO DISCLOSE CERTIFICATES OF REGISTRATION AND AUTHENTIC DEPOSITS OF REGISTERED WORKS by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - 2014-12-04 Defendants First Set of Written Discovery to Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - HTI BHTS Copyright Certificate of Registration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - U.S. Copyright Office Form LS, #4 Proposed Order (PDF Only) 2016-09-30 Proposed Order Motion in limine re Registered Works jdk)(Morse, Stuart)
September 30, 2016 Filing 69 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY REGARDING DAMAGES PRIOR TO FEBRUARY 21, 2011 AND STRIKING PLAINTIFFS EXPERT OPINIONS ON ECONONMIC DAMAGES by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Mark W. Pedigo Expert Report, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) 2016-09-30 Proposed Order Motion in limine re Damages JDK)(Morse, Stuart)
September 30, 2016 Filing 68 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING ANY EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY IN SUPPORT OF ITS LANHAM ACT CLAIMS BASED ON THE APPLICATION OF LACHES by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - 1990_01 AHNA Beginnings Newsletter re Healing Touch Warm Welcome (HTI-0461), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - 1990_12 HT Newsletter AHNA Piloted HT Program (CCHT 00618), #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - 1993_06_23 Mentgen Report on AHNA Board Meeting (HTI-4344), #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - 1993_07_22 CCHT Articles of Incorporation (CCHT 00270 - 00275), #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - 1994_01_08 AHNA Working Agreement with CCHT (CCHT 00239 - 00240), #6 Exhibit Exhibit F (Part 1) - 1994_06 AHNA Application for Certificate Program in HT (HTI-0562 - 0583), #7 Exhibit Exhibit F (Part 2) - 1994_06 AHNA Application for Certificate Program in HT (HTI-0562 - 0583), #8 Exhibit Exhibit G - 1995_08_01 CCHT Mentgen Ltr to AHNA re CCHT Contracting with AHNA HT Program (Deposition Exhibit 106), #9 Exhibit Exhibit H - 1995_08_18 AHNA Ltr to AHNA Members re CCHT Contract with AHNA and Internal Dispute over HT (Deposition Exhibit 108), #10 Exhibit Exhibit I - 1996_01_26 AHNA Winter Council Meeting re Certifying RNs only and HTI Creation (HTI-0355 - 0361), #11 Exhibit Exhibit J - 1996_03_06 HTI Articles of Incorporation - and CCHT Consent to use "Healing Touch" (HTI-0007 - 0013), #12 Exhibit Exhibit K - 1996_06_16 HTI BOD Minutes re HTI Roles (CCHT 00690 - 00691), #13 Exhibit Exhibit L - 1996_06_26 Mentgen Memo re AHNA Transfer of Ownership of HT Program to HTI (HTI-4817), #14 Exhibit Exhibit M - 1996_06_27 AHNA Annual Business Meeting Minutes re HTI Taking over AHNA HT Program (HTI-0363 - 0365), #15 Exhibit Exhibit N - 1996_07_29 AHNA ED Young Ltr to HTI Mentgen re Written Transfer of HT Program to HTI (HTI-0511), #16 Exhibit Exhibit O (Part 1) - 2006_03_22 HTI BOD Special Meeting re Mediation discuss knowledge proposed by legal advisor (HTI-1584 - 1602), #17 Exhibit Exhibit O (Part 2) - 2006_03_22 HTI BOD Special Meeting re Mediation discuss knowledge proposed by legal advisor (HTI-1584 - 1602), #18 Exhibit Exhibit P - 2006_04_13 HTI Ex Committee Letter to CCHT Faegre Benson re Hx of HT Program and HT Ownership (HTI-0513 - 0517), #19 Exhibit Exhibit Q - 2007_04_04 CCHT Lisa Gordon Ltr to HTI BOD re Termination of HTI Certification (CCHT 00049 - 00052), #20 Exhibit Exhibit R - 2007_07_11 HTI to Members re Hx of HTI and HT Program (HTI 01207 - 01226), #21 Exhibit Exhibit S - 2007_07_14 CCHT to General Public re CCHT Terminating Relationship with HTI (CCHT 00061 - 00065), #22 Exhibit Exhibit T - 2007_07_18 HTI Ellen Stewart Ltr to CCHT re Transfer of HT to HTI (CCHT 00491- 00493), #23 Proposed Order (PDF Only) 2016-09-30 Proposed Order Motion in limine re False Advertising JDK.pdf)(Morse, Stuart)
August 29, 2016 Filing 67 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Final Pretrial Conference held on 8/29/2016. Deadline for parties to file Motions in Limine 9/30/2016. Final Pretrial Conference will be reset following ruling on all Motions in Limine. Court Reporter: FTR - E. E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (emill)
August 29, 2016 Filing 66 Witness List (Amended) by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Morse, Stuart)
August 25, 2016 Filing 65 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Deadline to file proposed Final Pretrial Order terminated; filed as ordered. Text Only Entry (emill)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set 8/29/2016 01:30 PM is VACATED. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 8/29/2016 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/25/2016. Text Only Entry (emill)
August 23, 2016 Filing 63 Proposed Pretrial Order (Amended) Jointly Filed with Plaintiff by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Defendant's Witness List, #3 Exhibit Defendant's Exhibit List)(Morse, Stuart)
August 22, 2016 Filing 62 Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Defendant's Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit Defendant's Witness List)(Lineberger, Samira)
August 9, 2016 Filing 61 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Status Conference held on 8/9/2016. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/22/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Court Reporter: FTR - E. E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (emill)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER Status Conference set for 8/9/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Counsel Lineberger is granted leave to appear telephonically; all other counsel appear in person. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss items set forth in order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/24/2016. (emill)
February 11, 2016 Filing 59 MINUTE ENTRY FOR SETTLEMENT for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Settlement Conference held on 2/11/2016. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, )
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER: following an in-chambers phone call with counsel, it is ORDERED that a Settlement Conference will be held on 2/11/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 1/22/16. (cbssec)
January 6, 2016 Filing 57 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/6/2016. ORDERED: Parties are REQUIRED to exchange settlement offers by 1/11/2016. Each party is REQUIRED to submit a confidential settlement memo on or before 1/15/2016. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, )
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER setting a Telephone Status Conference for 1/6/2016 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, to discuss timing for holding a settlement conference. Counsel shall first initiate a conference call among themselves before contacting the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/15/15. (cbssec)
December 8, 2015 Filing 55 CASE REASSIGNED. This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer solely for the purposes of conducting a Settlement Conference, pursuant to Minute Order #54 . All future pleadings should be designated as 14-cv-00313-MJW-CBS. (Text Only Entry) (morti, )
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), D.C.COLO.LR16.6, and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), and at the request of counsel, it is ORDERED that this civil action is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer solely for the purposes of: (1) conducting an Settlement Conference, and (2) convening such settlement conferences and directing related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/8/15. (morti, )
December 7, 2015 Filing 53 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Final Pretrial Conference held on 12/7/2015. Final Pretrial Order is not entered. Parties' Joint Oral Motion to refer case for Settlement Conference is granted. Case shall be drawn and referred to a Magistrate Judge for the limited purpose of conducting a Settlement Conference. Court's Minute Order #51 is vacated. Court Reporter: FTR - E. E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (emill)
December 3, 2015 Filing 52 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Pursuant to Minute Order #51 Deadline to file Motions in Limine, trial briefs, or other trial motions 12/18/2015. Deadline to file responses 1/8/2016; replies 1/19/2016. Text Only Entry (emill)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 VACATED MINUTE ORDER : Orders prior to Final Pretrial Conference 12/7/2015 02:00 PM. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/3/2015. (emill) Modified on 12/7/2015 Pursuant to order in open court #53 Minute Order vacated. (emill)
November 30, 2015 Filing 50 Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Lineberger, Samira)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER Final Pretrial Conference 10/20/2015 02:00 PM is VACATED. Final Pretrial Conference RE-SET for 12/7/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/30/2015. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/19/2015. (emill)
September 11, 2015 Filing 48 Expert Witness Designation by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Report, #2 Exhibit CV, #3 Exhibit Fee Schedule, #4 Exhibit List of Testimony)(Morse, Stuart)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER Final Pretrial Conference 10/14/2015 01:30 PM is vacated. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 10/20/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/26/2015. (emill)
August 21, 2015 Filing 46 Expert Witness Designation Amended by Plaintiff Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lineberger, Samira)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #44 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Designate Expert Witnesses, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/07/2015.(slibi, )
August 7, 2015 Filing 44 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Designate Experts Witnesses by Plaintiff Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Lineberger, Samira)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER granting #41 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Original Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/27/2015.(slibi, )
July 25, 2015 Filing 42 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended) against Healing Touch International, Inc, filed by Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc.(Lineberger, Samira)
July 25, 2015 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Lineberger, Samira)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER; The Scheduling Order #21 is AMENDED as stated in this order. Discovery due by 7/31/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2015. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2015 10:00 AM is VACATED and RE-SET for 10/14/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. It is further ORDERED that the Notice of Substitution of Counsel #38 which the Court views as a motion for withdrawal under D.C.LAttyR 5(b), is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/3/15. (morti, )
June 3, 2015 Filing 39 STATEMENT of The Parties (joint) by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Morse, Stuart)
June 3, 2015 Filing 38 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc (Morse, Stuart)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER; #36 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and File Initial Expert Designation is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint statement, on or before June 3, 2015, stating the parties respective positions on this scheduling matter, explaining why the motion was not filed earlier, and explaining why communications with each other have not been handled in a timely manner. The joint statement shall include a certification under Local Rule 6.1(c) that the joint statement has been served on both parties clients, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/1/15.(morti, )
May 29, 2015 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to complete discovery and file initial expert designation by Plaintiff Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Glade, Michael)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER granting #32 Plaintiff's First Amended Motion for Extension of Time to File Initial Expert Designation. Scheduling Order #21 is amended as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/25/2015.(emill)
March 24, 2015 Filing 34 RESPONSE to #32 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Designate Expert Witnesses filed by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Morse, Stuart)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER On or before 3/24/2015, Defendant shall file a statement as to whether or not it opposes #32 Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Extension of Time to Designate Expert Witnesses, as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/23/2015. (emill)
March 20, 2015 Filing 32 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Designate Expert Witnesses by Plaintiff Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Lineberger, Samira)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #30 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Initial Expert Designation. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/17/2015. (emill)
March 16, 2015 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Designation of Experts by Plaintiff Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Lineberger, Samira)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTEORDER granting #28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Todd R. Scardina terminated, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/31/2014.(emill)
December 30, 2014 Filing 28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Todd R. Scardina by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Morse, Stuart)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER granting #26 parties' joint Motion for Approval of Joint Stipulated Revised Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order #21 is amended, as set forth in the order. Discovery due by 5/30/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2015. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/19/2014.(emill)
December 18, 2014 Filing 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #21 Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Glade, Michael)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER denying as not a proper motion #24 First Motion for Discovery to Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc., by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/04/2014.(slibi, )
December 4, 2014 Filing 24 First MOTION for Discovery To Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc. by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Morse, Stuart)
October 24, 2014 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance TODD R. SCARDINA by Stuart Douglas Morse on behalf of Healing Touch International, Inc (Morse, Stuart)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER Final Pretrial Conference 6/2/2015 09:00 AM is vacated. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 6/8/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/2/2014. (emill)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/15/2014. (emill)
May 15, 2014 Filing 20 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Scheduling Conference held on 5/15/2014. Discovery due by 2/27/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 3/30/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/26/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (emill)
May 14, 2014 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Morse, Stuart)
May 9, 2014 Filing 18 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Morse, Stuart)
April 23, 2014 Filing 17 Defendant's ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Healing Touch International, Inc.(Morse, Stuart)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #9 Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/11/2014.(emill)
April 11, 2014 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc. (Lineberger, Samira)
April 10, 2014 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Healing Touch International, Inc, filed by Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc.(Lineberger, Samira)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Scheduling/Planning Conference. Scheduling Conference reset for 5/15/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/31/2014. (eseam)
March 31, 2014 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue Scheduling/Planning Conference by Plaintiff Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document signature Defendant counsel)(Lineberger, Samira)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge: Upon consent of the parties evidenced by Docket Entry #10, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe for all purposes pursuant to the Courts Pilot Program and 28 U.S.C. 636(c). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/25/14. Text Only Entry (msksec, )
March 25, 2014 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Morse, Stuart)
March 17, 2014 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Healing Touch International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morse, Stuart)
February 26, 2014 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc. All Defendants. (Lineberger, Samira)
February 21, 2014 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued pursuant to Magistrate Judge Pilot Project to Assign Civil Cases to Full Time Magistrate Judges (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (slibi, )
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER On or before 3/25/2014, parties shall complete and file the Pilot Program Consent Form #3 . Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/4/2014. (mjwcd)
February 4, 2014 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Healing Touch International, Inc by Plaintiff Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc. (Glade, Michael)
February 4, 2014 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrigts (sphil, )
February 4, 2014 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued purusant to Magistrate Judge Pilot Project to Assign Civil Cases to Full Time Magistrate Judges. Summons submitted on incorrect/improper court approved form. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (sphil, )
February 3, 2014 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Text Only Entry (sphil, )
February 3, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT againstHealing Touch International, Inc (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-3720473)Attorney Michael J. Glade added to party Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc d/b/a Healing Touch Program(pty:pla), filed by Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc d/b/a Healing Touch Program. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 Disclosure)(Glade, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc v. Healing Touch International, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healing Touch International, Inc
Represented By: Sean Richard Cumberlege
Represented By: Stuart Douglas Morse
Represented By: Jason Douglas Krueger
Represented By: Todd R. Scardina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc
Represented By: Samira Mery Lineberger
Represented By: Michael J. Glade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Center for Healing Touch, Inc doing business as Healing Touch Program
Represented By: Samira Mery Lineberger
Represented By: Michael J. Glade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?