Boxer F2, L.P. v. Flamingo West, Ltd. et al.
Plaintiff: Boxer F2, L.P.
Defendant: Flamingo West, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00317
Filed: February 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, and Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Plaintiff shall submit its proposed calculation of damages due to Boxer as a result of Mr. Bronchick's breach of the lease agreement on or before June 25, 2016 and Mr. Bronchick shall submit his proposed damages calculation on or before July 6, 2016. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 06/17/2016. (athom, )
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Bench Trial - Day One held on 10/26/2015. ORDER granting 163 Motion to Strike. Court Reporter: Janet Coppock. (kpreu)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER. Defendants William Bronchick and Bronchick & Associates, P.C.'s renewed motion for partial summary judgment 96 is DENIED. Plaintiff Boxer F2, L.P.'s motion for partial summary judgment 95 is GRANTED in part as against Flamingo West and DENIED as against Bronchick & Associates, P.C. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/23/15.(pabsec)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER re 162 Defendants William Bronchick and Bronchick & Associates, P.C.'s Amended Objections to Plaintiff's Designations of Deposition Testimony. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/16/15. (pabsec)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to the Court's Order Dated May 4, 2015; 133 Motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART for the reasons set forth in the body of this Order, and Plaintiff isawarded $23,597.78 to be taxed jointly and severally against all Defendants.Defendants shall pay to Plaintiff $23,597.78 on or before July 10, 2015, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/11/15.(morti, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting 89 Plaintiff's Motion to Renew Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2), as set forth in the Order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/4/2015.(emill)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Setting Case for Trial Bench Trial set for 10/26/2015 08:30 AM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 10/9/2015 at 02:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 05/01/15. (jhawk, )
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Motion Hearing / Final Pretrial Conference held on 4/29/2015. Taking under advisement 89 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2). Final Pretrial Order entered. Final Pretrial Conference 5/5/2015 09:00 AM is vacated. Court Reporter: FTR - E. E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (emill)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTE ORDER granting 100 Motion for Leave to File SUR-Reply ; granting 102 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/10/2015.(agarc, )
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER re: 87 Stipulation Attorney Fees filed by Boxer F2, L.P., by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/20/2015. (agarc, )
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion to Strike, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/11/2015.(agarc, )
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER granting 83 Stipulated Motion to Amend Second Amended Scheduling Order. Second Amended Scheduling Order 60 is amended. Discovery due by 3/1/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/2015. Defendants may take Plaintiff's deposition under Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(6). By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/9/2015.(emill)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER granting 62 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 15.1(b), Plaintiff shall file and serve the amended pleading on all parties under Fed. R. Civ. P. 5 no later than 14 days after the filing of th[is] order by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/28/14.(jhawk, )
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Motions Hearing held on 8/28/2014. Granting 40 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's First Set o f Interrogatories and Requests for Production. Granting 44 Plaintiffs Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order and Reset the Pretrial Conference. Scheduling Order 25 is amended. Discovery due by 2/17/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 3/7/2015 . Final Pretrial Conference 1/13/2015 09:30 AM is vacated. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/28/2015. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 5/5/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Denying 52 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Exhibits A and B to Defendants' Reply In Support of the Motion for Summary Judgment. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (emill)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/08/14.(jhawk, )
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/10/2014. (emill)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/21/2014. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boxer F2, L.P. v. Flamingo West, Ltd. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boxer F2, L.P.
Represented By: John Wesley Headrick, Jr.
Represented By: Adrienne Lee Toon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flamingo West, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?