Harrison v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company et al.
Plaintiff: Jack D. Harrison and Naoma Harrison
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company and Mario Aragon Agency
Case Number: 1:2014cv00328
Filed: February 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice. ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 07/09/15. (jhawk, )
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER denying 67 Plaintiffs' Motion to Allow Expert Novotny to Withdraw and Re-Designate Valuation Expert, as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/11/2015.(emill)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Setting Case for Trial. Jury Trial set for 7/13/2015 8:00 AM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 6/26/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/04/15. (jhawk, ) Modified on 2/5/2015 to correct text (jhawk, ).
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 1/8/2015. Granting 36 Defendant American Family's Motion to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order Conc erning Deposition of John Craver, Esq. Deposition of John Craver, Esq. shall be had 1/20/2015 01:00 PM. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/28/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Court Reporter: FTR - E. E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (emill)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Motion to Dismiss Claims Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Mario Aragon Agency Without Prejudice by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/26/14.(jhawk, )
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER: DENYING 28 Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order to Extend the Discovery, Deposition, and Dispositive Motion Deadlines. Scheduling Order is not amended. Final Pretrial Conference remains set 1/21/2015 09:00 AM. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/25/2014.(emill)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Expert and Rebuttal Expert Designation Deadlines and Discovery Cutoff. Discovery due by 12/30/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/14/2015 by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 06/18/14.(jhawk, )
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Stipulated Motion to Appear Telephonically. Plaintiffs' counsel may appear by telephone for the Scheduling Conference 4/15/2014 10:00 AM Mountain Time, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/14/2014.(emill)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/15/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/7/14. (mfiel, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack D. Harrison
Represented By: James B. Panther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naoma Harrison
Represented By: James B. Panther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Aragon Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?