Martinez et al v. Red's Towing
Plaintiff: Leonard Martinez, Doug Patrick, Samantha Patrick, Devin Quintana, Scott Rosenbaum, Steven Rosenbaum, Joseph Vialpando, Michael Wolfe, Dennis Gregory, Francisco Medina and Scottie Lee Wray
Defendant: Red's Towing
Case Number: 1:2014cv00458
Filed: February 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:215
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 AMENDED JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Dennis Gregory, Devin Quintana, Doug Patrick, Francisco Medina, Jesse Mendoza, Joseph Vialpando, Samantha Patrick, Scott Rosenbaum, Scottie Lee Wray, Steven Rosenbaum against Red's Towing re: 81 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, on 7/27/15. (morti, )
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/23/15. # 63 Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. # 76 Motion for Attorney's Fees [#76] is DENIED as moot. # 78 Amended Motion for Attorneys Fees is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs are awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $43,955.00. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Judgment # 42 entered on November 26, 2014, is AMENDED to include the award of attorneys' fees to Plaintiffs. (lgale, )
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/7/15. Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With the Court Determining Reasonable Fees and Costs # 74 is GRANTED. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2), this case is DISMISSED and the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Leonard Martinez and Michael Wolfe shall file a motion regarding fees and costs on or before May 26, 2015. Plaintiffs shall comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.3.(lgale, )(lgale, )
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/20/15.Motion for Summary Judgment as to Liability # 67 is GRANTED to the extent it seeks entry of summary judgment against Defendant with respect to Defendant's liability under the FLSA. IT IS FU RTHER ORDERED that judgment shall enter in favor of Plaintiffs Michael Wolfe and Leonard Martinez with respect to Defendant's liability under the FLSA. This matter shall proceed to trial on the sole issue of the amount of damages, if any, due to Plaintiffs Michael Wolfe and Leonard Martinez. (lgale, )
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/23/15.Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss # 50 is DENIED.(lgale, )
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 45 Plaintiffs' Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.60 Relief From Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/23/15.(sgrim)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/15/2015. Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt of Court and Sanctions [#51] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Discovery deadline extended to 3/16/2015. Dispositi ve Motions extended to 3/16/2015. Final Pretrial Conference RESET to 6/16/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Jury Trial RESET to 8/17/2015 9:00 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. FTR: KLM Courtroom C204. (lgale, )
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/12/14.Unopposed Motion for Post Judgment Relief Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) [#46] is GRANTED.(lgale, )
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 68 by Clerk in favor of Plaintiffs Dennis Gregory, Devin Quintana, Doug Patrick, Francisco Medina, Jesse Mendoza, Joseph Vialpando, Samantha Patrick, Scott Rosenbaum, Scottie Lee Wray, and Steven Rosenbaum and against Defendant Red's Towing re: 32 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment, for amounts and terms as specified in the Offer of Judgment. Entered by Clerk on Nov. 26, 2014. (ebutl)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re 35 Emergency MOTION for Hearing/Conference, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/25/2014. ORDERED that the portion of the Motion 35 taken under advisement on November 17, 2014, is DENIED without prejudice. (slibi, )
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Civil Trial Procedures Order; FPTC/TPC will be held on 3/24/2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/17/2015. The four-day Jury Trial is set for 5/11/2015 - 5/14/2015 starting at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/18/14. (morti, )
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER; Plaintiffs' 18 Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint and Join Plaintiff Jesse Mendoza is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall accept the SecondAmended Complaint [#18-1] for filing as of the date of this Minute Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/11/14.(morti, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. Red's Towing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Martinez
Represented By: Sara Ann Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Patrick
Represented By: Sara Ann Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Patrick
Represented By: Sara Ann Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Quintana
Represented By: Sara Ann Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Rosenbaum
Represented By: Sara Ann Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Rosenbaum
Represented By: Sara Ann Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Vialpando
Represented By: Sara Ann Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wolfe
Represented By: Sara Ann Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Gregory
Represented By: Sara Ann Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Medina
Represented By: Sara Ann Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottie Lee Wray
Represented By: Sara Ann Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red's Towing
Represented By: Robert Justin Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?