April 13, 2016 |
Filing
207
ORDER RE: 190 Notice of Completion of Limited Appearance filed by James Faircloth is Stricken. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/13/2016. (cmira)
|
March 24, 2016 |
Filing
192
ORDER Denying 118 Motion to Strike; Denying as Moot 123 CCA Defendants Motion for Extension of Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Recent Motions; Denying as Moot 124 CDOC Defendants Motion for Extension of Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Recent Motions. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/24/2016. (cmira)
|
January 25, 2016 |
Filing
165
TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER That all motions raising issues under Fed. R. Evid. 702, 703, or 704 as codified and construed shall be filed by August 15, 2016. Jury Trial set for 12/12/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001; That the court reser ves five (5) days for trial. That a combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference (conference) shall commence on November 18, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. (MST), in courtroom A1001, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/25/2016. (evana, )
|
December 7, 2015 |
Filing
163
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/7/15. CCA Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Allow Representative to Participate in Settlement Conference by Telephone # 161 is GRANTED.(lgale, )
|
November 19, 2015 |
Filing
154
ORDER That the stay in this matter is lifted; and That the magistrate judge is respectfully requested to convene a scheduling conference in this matter as soon as practicable; provided, that in conjunction with the scheduling conference, the magistrate judge shall contact this chambers to determine appropriate dates for the combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference and the trial of this matter, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/19/2015. (evana, )
|
September 3, 2015 |
Filing
147
MINUTE ORDER; 142 Motion for Leave to Provide Limited ScopeRepresentation Pursuant to D.COLO.LAttyR 2(a) is GRANTED. The Notice ofLimited Representation Entry of Appearance of Elisabeth L. Owen [#142-1] is accepted for filing as of the date of t his Minute Order. To the extent the Status Report 143 requests an extension of the stay entered in this case, it is GRANTED. The stay entered in this case is extended through November 27, 2015. If a Notice of Settlement or dismissal papers have not been filed by that date, Plaintiff shall file a Status Report on or before November 27, 2015 informing the Court of the status of this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail the August 18, 2015 Order [#140] to Plaintiff with this Minute Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/3/15.(morti, )
|
August 18, 2015 |
Filing
140
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/18/15. Motion for Order of Injunction and T.R.O. to Defendant'(s)to [sic] Not Impede Access to the Court(s) and/or Combined Motion for Counsel in the Alternative # 137 is DENIED without prejudice.(lgale, )
|
June 23, 2015 |
Filing
131
ORDER; 129 Petition for Stay of Proceedings to Consult with Attorney is GRANTED. This is case is STAYED through 8/30/15. 109 Motion for Extension of Time to File, 111 Motion for Leave, 112 Motion to Certify Class and 113 Motion to Appo int Counsel are DENIED with prejudice. On or before 8/30/2015, Plaintiff shall file a Status Report informing the Court: (1) whether he has obtained representation and (2) whether he intends to move forward with this lawsuit. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of this case, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/23/15.(morti, )
|
June 15, 2015 |
Filing
128
MINUTE ORDER; 125 Motion to Strike Impertinent Parts of Amended Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(f) and 15 or Rule 11 is DENIED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/15/15.(morti, )
|
March 16, 2015 |
Filing
106
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 102 Motion to Stay; granting 104 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on or before 4/20/215. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/16/2015.(alowe)
|
February 11, 2015 |
Filing
101
ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO AMEND: The 52 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is DENIED. The 78 Motion to Strike 1st Amended Complaint for Leave to Correct the Deficiencies in the Complaint to Re-File is DENIED. The 85 Petition to Strike Previous Amended Complaint and Leave to Amend Prisoner Complaint is DENIED. The 90 Petition to Strike Previous Amended Complaint and Leave to Amend Prisoner Complaint is DENIED. The 93 Petition for Leave to Add Named Parties to Party List is D ENIED. The 94 Petition for Leave to Re-File Amended Complaint and Motions is DENIED. Defendants' 30 , 46 Motions to Dismiss are DENIED as moot. The 53 , 86 , 92 Motions for Class Certification Complaint Class Action are DENIED. Plain tiff MAY FILE an amended complaint which complies with the requirements specified in this order by 3/4/2015. Plaintiff, James Faircloth, is WARNED that the filing of an amended complaint that does not comply with the requirements of this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, which may include dismissal of this case. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/11/2015. (alowe)
|
September 18, 2014 |
Filing
64
MINUTE ORDER granting 55 Motion to Correct; granting 56 Motion to Correct. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the paragraph that begins with the number three is STRICKEN from Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint [#52]. IT IS FURTHER O RDERED that the proposed Amended Complaint [#52-1] is modified to strike the second reference to Jefferson County Community Corrections Board in the caption and to add Lt. Ackers to the caption. ORDER granting 61 Motion for Extension of Time to F ile Response/Reply ; granting 62 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Moving Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint [#52] and Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification Complaint Class Action [#53] on or before 9/19/2014, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/18/2014.(slibi, )
|
March 21, 2014 |
Filing
22
ORDER Drawing Case to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/21/2014. (agarc, )
|
February 24, 2014 |
Filing
8
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/24/2014. (slibi, )
|