Martinez et al v. City of Aurora, The, et al.

Plaintiff: Franco Martinez, Dana Martinez and Paul Gomez, Jr.
Defendant: City of Aurora, The, Timothy Huffman, Christopher Cruser, Kenneth Martinez, Brad Graham and Randal Moody
Case Number: 1:2014cv00619
Filed: February 27, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 54 defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment shall enter in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs as to plaintiffs' first through sixth claims for relief. Plaintiffs' seventh claim for relief is dismissed without prejudice. The January 15, 2016 Trial Preparation Conference and the February 1, 2016 Trial are VACATED. This case is dismissed in its entirety. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/8/16.(pabsec)
August 27, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Case for Trial. Jury Trial set for 2/1/2016 08:00 AM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/15/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 08/27/15. (jhawk, )
March 4, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/4/15. Unopposed Motion to File Rebuttal Reports # 42 is GRANTED.(lgale, )
January 26, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/26/15. Amended Motion to Amend Complaint [#36] is GRANTED. (lgale, )
January 5, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/5/15.Motion to Amend Complaint [#32] is DENIED without prejudice.(lgale, )
December 8, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Discovery due by 3/16/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 4/27/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/13/2015. Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/20/2015 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Entered by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/08/14.(jhawk, )
October 10, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Motion for an Extension of Time to File Expert Reports Until November 10, 2014 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/10/14.(jhawk, )
August 29, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice as to Investigator Kenneth Martinez. Each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 08/29/14.(jhawk, )
August 11, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/11/14. Stipulated Consent to Amend Aurora Defendants' Answer and Stipulated Motion to Amend Civil Scheduling Order 18 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Amended Civil Scheduling [#18-1] supplied by the parties is accepted for filing and entered as an Order of the Court, as of the date of this Minute Order.(lgale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. City of Aurora, The, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franco Martinez
Represented By: Kevin C. Flesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Martinez
Represented By: Kevin C. Flesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Gomez, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin C. Flesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Aurora, The
Represented By: Julia A. Bannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Cruser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randal Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?