Arkansas River Power Authority v. Babcock &Wilcox Power Generation Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: Arkansas River Power Authority
Defendant: Babcock &Wilcox Power Generation Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00638
Filed: February 28, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Prowers
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2017 334 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Post Trial Motions Nos. 302, 303, 324 by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/21/2017. (swest)
January 27, 2016 184 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 01/27/16 GRANTING 181 Motion to Stay. The portion of the Order [#180] directing Plaintiff to produce Mr. Gendreaus December 2013 Draft Report no later than January 22, 2016 is STAYED; and all other portions of the Order REMAIN IN EFFECT.(nmarb, )
January 15, 2016 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 122 Motion to Strike; denying 128 Motion to Compel; denying 151 Motion for Leave to Restrict; denying 160 Motion for Leave to Restrict; denying 168 Motion for Order; denying 169 Motion for Order. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to UNRESTRICT [#128-1] and [#146]. Counsel for ARPA will PRODUCE a copy of Mr. Gendreau's December 2013 Draft Report to B&W no later than January 22, 2016. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/15/16. (nywlc1)
December 11, 2015 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 118 and 119 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/11/2015. (athom, )
November 2, 2015 163 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held on 11/2/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant'S Disclosure of Non-Retained Experts 122 is SUBMITTED and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. ARPA's Motion to Compel Production of Design Standards 128 is SUBMITTED and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (bsimm, )
October 1, 2015 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 108 Motion for Protective Order. ARPA will arrange for Mr. Gendreau to be deposed on the limited issues identified in this Order no later than 10/23/15. Discovery remains closed for all other purposes. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/1/15. (nywlc1)
September 9, 2015 126 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/ MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held on 9/9/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Non-Party Syncora Guarantee Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order 108 is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Written order to issue. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (bsimm, )
June 30, 2015 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 06/30/15 granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion to Quash; and granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion to Compel. Dispositive Motions due by 8/24/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
May 27, 2015 100 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held on 5/27/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang re: Defendant's Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony and Production of Documents 87 . The Motion is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Parties will meet and confer, and utilize the court's informal discovery process, before the filing of a formal motion related to the issue. FTR: Courtroom C-205. (bsimm, )
May 5, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion to Compel. Defendant shall supplement its responses to Interrogatories, to the extent it is required to do so, no later than 5/19/15. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/5/15. (nywlc1)
March 18, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held on 3/18/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Motion to Amend Complaint and Jury Demand 39 is GRANTED. Babcock & Wilcox Power Generation Group, Inc.'s Motion to Amend Scheduling Orde r 42 is GRANTED IN PART. Motion to Quash Defendant's Fed.R.Civ.P 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition and for Protective Order 60 is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Stipulated Joint Motion to Restrict Access 71 is GRANTED. Motion to Compel Further Responses to Discovery 35 is SUBMITTED and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Status Report due by 3/23/2015. FTR: Courtroom C-205. (bsimm, )
March 13, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 73 Motion for Leave. Defendant may file the proposed document designated on the docket as No. 73-1. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 03/13/2013. (athom, ) Modified on 3/13/2015 to correct text (athom, ).
March 9, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 40 Unopposed Motion to Restrict Access to Certain Exhibits to Motion to Amend Complaint and Jury Demand. The Unopposed Motion is DENIED without prejudice for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2(c)(2)-(4). By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 03/09/2015. (athom, )
February 25, 2015 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 65 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. Discovery due by 4/14/2015. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y Wang on 02/25/2015. (athom, )
November 25, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/25/14 re: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Discovery 52 . The Motion is GRANTED and plaintiff may reply to the Motion on or before 12/8/2014. (bsimm, )
May 19, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/19/2014. (athom, )
March 6, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/6/14. Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. (Simmons, B.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arkansas River Power Authority v. Babcock &Wilcox Power Generation Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas River Power Authority
Represented By: Craig Norris Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Babcock &Wilcox Power Generation Group, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Clay Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?