Kherdeen et al v. Obama
Plaintiff: Jim Khen and Mazen J. Kherdeen
Defendant: Barack Hussain Obama
Case Number: 1:2014cv00678
Filed: March 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER denying 25 2nd Motion to Compell [sic] the Court to Rule on Ripe Motion Dated 9/08/2014 by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/24/14.(dkals, )
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 23 Motion to Alter or Amend 'Dismissal Order Without Prejudice' Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/26/14.(dkals, )
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice, and denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/22/14. (dkals, )
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER To Cure Deficiencies, and ORDER DENYING wtihout prejudice 10 Motion for Order; and DENYING 11 Motion for Certification as Class Action Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 23 and Request for Jury Trial, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/12/14.(nmarb, )
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part 16 Motion for Reconsideration. The Order of Dismissal (ECF No. 5 ) and the Judgment (ECF No. 6 ) entered in this action on April 15, 2014, are VACATED as to Plaintiff Mazen J. Kherdeen only. The clerk of the Court reinstat e and return this action to the Pro Se Docket. Plaintiff Kherdeen shall be the only named Plaintiff in the reinstated case. The April 22, 2014 Minute Order denying ECF Nos. 7 , 9 , 10 and 11 shall also be VACATED. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/4/2014.(klyon, )
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot all pending motions by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/22/14.(dkals, )
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 5 Order, by Clerk on 4/15/2014. (klyon, )
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiffs To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/6/14. (nmarb, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kherdeen et al v. Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barack Hussain Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Khen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mazen J. Kherdeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?