USA v. Hepburn
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Daniel Hepburn
Case Number: 1:2014cv00749
Filed: March 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: La Plata
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Defaulted Student Loans (Excl. Veterans)
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 the Joint Motion for Relief from Order of Dismissal. This matter is placed on administrative closure pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2. In furtherance of the administrative closure, the parties are ordered to submit a joint stat us report to the Court not later than May 6, 2015. If either party fails to file a status report by May 6, 2015, the case shall be automatically reopened and dismissed for lack of prosecution. by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/6/2015.(evana, )
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re: 15 Order directing the parties to submit a joint status report to the Court not later than December 1, 2014. I further ordered that should either party fail to file a status report by December 1, 2014, the case shall be automatically re opened and subject to dismissal for lack of prosecution. No status report has been filed to date. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that this matter is reopened for good cause shown pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2 and DISMISSED for lack of prosecution. by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/18/2014. (evana, )
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 the Motion to Administratively Close the Case, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/21/2014.(evana, )
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/19/2014. (emill)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?