Al-Turki v. Department of Justice

Plaintiff: Homaidan Al-Turki
Defendant: Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2014cv00802
Filed: March 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART, DENIED AS MOOT IN PART, AND DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN PART, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/30/2016.(evana, )
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that Defendants Motion for Leave to File In Camera and Ex Parte Declaration ECF No. 27 is GRANTED. The In Camera and Ex Parte Declaration shall be submitted to my Chambers within ten (10) days of this Order, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/13/2015.(evana, )
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a presiding judge and, if appropriate, to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/19/14. (smoor, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al-Turki v. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homaidan Al-Turki
Represented By: Faisal Ahmed Salahuddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Represented By: Timothy Bart Jafek(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?